Romero v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, et al
Plaintiff: Herb Romero and Herb Anthony Romero
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., OneBeacon America Insurance Company, Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, as Insurer of Wayne Manufacturing, Eagle Inc., McCarty Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Wayne Manufacturing Company, Eagle, Inc. and Lamorak Insurance Company
3Rd Party Defendant: Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, Uniroyal, Inc., Manville Trust and Uniroyal Holding, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Cross Defendant: Claims Resolution Management Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv00982
Filed: March 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #17 Motion for Reconsideration is DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on May 19, 2020. (mp)
May 18, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Herb Anthony Romero re #17 MOTION for Reconsideration . (Anderman, Jody)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #17 MOTION for Reconsideration. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff Herb Anthony Romero shall file a response no later than THURSDAY, MAY 21, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Huntington Ingalls Incorporated and Lamorak Insurance Company shall file a response no later than THURSDAY, MAY 21, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion will be submitted on that date. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on May 15, 2020.(mp)
May 13, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Reconsideration by Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Notice of Submission)(Semmes, Mathilde)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT: Considering defendants' unopposed motion to withdraw their notice of removal, which the Court construes as a motion to remand, IT IS ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that the above-captioned matter is REMANDED to the Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, State of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on May 11, 2020.(mp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/12/2020: #1 Remand Letter) (mp).
May 11, 2020 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Document re #1 Notice of Removal, by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David)
May 8, 2020 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Document re #1 Notice of Removal, by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #12 Motion to Continue the Deadline to File Opposition is GRANTED and that the defendants' response is due no later than MAY 11, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff may file a reply to the defendants' response no later than MAY 18, 2020, and the motion to remand will be deemed submitted on that date. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on April 30, 2020. (mp)
April 28, 2020 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Deadline to File Opposition to Motion to Remand by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Powell, Michael)
April 28, 2020 Filing 11 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Thomas M. Flanagan, Anders F. Holmgren for Herb Anthony Romero. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on April 23, 2020. (mp)
April 23, 2020 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record. Filing attorney did not include a proposed order. Proposed Order subsequently provided to Clerk and has now been attached to the motion. (mp)
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Herb Anthony Romero. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Notice of Submission, #30 Proposed Order)(Anderman, Jody)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Thomas M. Flanagan and Anders F. Holmgren by Herb Anthony Romero. (Anderman, Jody) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2020: #1 Proposed Order) (mp).
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (Bell, Troy)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Melancon, David)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by OneBeacon America Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Lamorak Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Bedivere Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Trebuchet Investments, Limited, Corporate Parent Armour Group Holdings, Limited, Corporate Parent Trebuchet US Holdings, Inc. for OneBeacon America Insurance Company (Rosamond, Samuel)
March 24, 2020 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk re Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(b).(mp)
March 23, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess)
March 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2019-7354 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8227852) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, OneBeacon America Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party OneBeacon America Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Melancon, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romero v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Uniroyal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Manville Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Uniroyal Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Kassie Lee Richbourg
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Amy Louise Maccherone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herb Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herb Anthony Romero
Represented By: Anders F. Holmgren
Represented By: Cameron Waddell
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Represented By: Jody Edward Anderman
Represented By: Claire Carville Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: Laura M. Gillen,
Represented By: Whitney Charmaine Stewart,
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Grace, III
Represented By: Erin Helen Boyd,
Represented By: Brian C. Bossier,
Represented By: Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Richard J. Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneBeacon America Insurance Company
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Brittney Bullock Ankersen
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, as Insurer of Wayne Manufacturing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarty Corporation
Represented By: April Ann McQuillar
Represented By: Janice M. Culotta
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: Douglas Watson Redfearn
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Brittney Bullock Ankersen
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle, Inc.
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: Douglas Watson Redfearn
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamorak Insurance Company
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Samuel Milton Rosamond, III
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Amanda Marie Crowley Fraser
Represented By: Adam Devlin deMahy
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Michael Kevin Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Claims Resolution Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?