Bierria v. Genesis Energy, LLC
Plaintiff: Jimmie Bierria
Defendant: Genesis Energy, LLC and Genesis Marine, LLC of Delaware
Case Number: 2:2020cv00993
Filed: March 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30104
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 3:00 PM before Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. Jury Trial set for 5/24/2021 at 9:00 AM before Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. All discovery must be completed by 3/24/2021. (Attachment(s): #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF: Magistrate Judge)(sbs)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(sbs)
April 1, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Genesis Energy, LLC, Genesis Marine, LLC of Delaware. Attorney Evans Martin McLeod added to party Genesis Energy, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Evans Martin McLeod added to party Genesis Marine, LLC of Delaware(pty:dft).(McLeod, Evans)
March 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7.(sbs)
March 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Genesis Energy, LLC. (sbs)
March 24, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go)
March 23, 2020 Filing 1 SEAMAN COMPLAINT with jury demand against Genesis Energy, LLC (Prepayment of fee not required pursuant to 28 USC 1916) filed by Jimmie Bierria. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney A. Spencer Gulden added to party Jimmie Bierria(pty:pla).(Gulden, A.) Modified text on 3/24/2020 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bierria v. Genesis Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Bierria
Represented By: A. Spencer Gulden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Energy, LLC
Represented By: Justin Cole Warner
Represented By: Evans Martin McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Marine, LLC of Delaware
Represented By: Justin Cole Warner
Represented By: Evans Martin McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?