Robertson, et al v Lopinto, et al
Plaintiff: Daviri Oseanus Robertson, Keshaun Morgan and Darrelyn Smith
Defendant: Unidentified Parties and Joseph P. Lopinto, III
Not Classified By Court: JOHN OFFICER DOE 2, JOHN OFFICER DOE1, JOHN OFFICER DOE 4, JOSEPH, III LOPINTO and JOHN OFFICER DOE 3
Case Number: 2:2020cv01006
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Joseph P. Lopinto, III. (mm)
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 Request of Summons Issued as to Joseph P. Lopinto, III filed by Daviri Oseanus Robertson re #1 Complaint. (Roby, Clarence)
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #2 Complaint. **1. Document filed in error. See rec doc. 1 for correct entry. No further action is necessary. 2. Civil Cover Sheet filed at this entry was correctly attached to record document 1** (mm)
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Redacted complaint subsequently provided to Clerk and has now been attached. 2. Civil cover sheet was not provided with original complaint filed. It was attached from record document 2.** (mm)
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 **FILED IN ERROR-SEE REC. DOC. 1** COMPLAINT (Fee previously paid) filed by Daviri Oseanus Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roby, Clarence) Modified text on 3/31/2020 (mm).
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BLAEDC-8233568) filed by Daviri Oseanus Robertson. Attorney Clarence Roby, Jr added to party Daviri Oseanus Robertson(pty:pla).(Roby, Clarence) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/31/2020) (mm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/31/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mm). Modified text on 3/31/2020 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson, et al v Lopinto, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: JOHN OFFICER DOE 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: JOHN OFFICER DOE1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: JOHN OFFICER DOE 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: JOSEPH, III LOPINTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: JOHN OFFICER DOE 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daviri Oseanus Robertson
Represented By: Clarence Roby, Jr.
Represented By: Tony Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keshaun Morgan
Represented By: Tony Dooley
Represented By: Clarence Roby, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrelyn Smith
Represented By: Tony Dooley
Represented By: Clarence Roby, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph P. Lopinto, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?