Ellis v. Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Zachary Ellis
Defendant: Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, National General Insurance Company, Paul Marchand, Darrell Hoskins and Imperial Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01012
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company.Attorney Nicholas Clark Gristina added to party Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Gristina, Nicholas) Modified text on 5/20/2020 (mp).
May 15, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company. (mp)
May 14, 2020 Filing 16 Request of Summons Issued as to Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company filed by Zachary Ellis re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Byrne, George)
May 13, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Paul Marchand. (mp)
May 13, 2020 Filing 14 Request of Summons Issued as to Paul Marchand filed by Zachary Ellis re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Byrne, George)
May 13, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Darrell Hoskins. (mp)
May 13, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Byrne, George)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that the #3 Motion to Remand to State Court is DENIED. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on May 13, 2020. (mp)
May 6, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Imperial Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.Attorney P. M. Donovan added to party Imperial Fire and Casualty Insurance Company(pty:selreq).(Donovan, P.)
April 21, 2020 Filing 9 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Indian Harbor Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent XL Group LTD, Corporate Parent XL Bermuda Ltd., Corporate Parent AXA Assurance Vie Mutuelle, Corporate Parent AXA SA, Corporate Parent XL Reinsurance America Inc., Corporate Parent XL Specialty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent X.L. America, Inc. for Indian Harbor Insurance Company (Albert, Andrea)
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Indian Harbor Insurance Company.(Albert, Andrea)
April 21, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Albert, Andrea)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Katherine Elaine Ann Currie for Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Attorney Stephen J. Eckholdt terminated. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on April 16, 2020. (mp)
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Katherine E. Currie to be substituted in place of Stephen J. Eckholdt by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Albert, Andrea)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Zachary Ellis. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Byrne, George) Modified on 4/10/2020 (blg).
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2020-2656 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8233932) filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment - List of Plainiff Counsel)Attorney Andrea Leigh Albert added to party Indian Harbor Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Albert, Andrea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Leandro Ryan Area
Represented By: Matthew R. Feigler
Represented By: Nicholas Clark Gristina
Represented By: Gordon P. Guthrie
Represented By: Andrew Garrett West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen J. Eckholdt
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Albert
Represented By: Katherine Elaine Ann Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Marchand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: P. M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Ellis
Represented By: Robert Brent Cueria
Represented By: George W. Byrne, Jr.
Represented By: Allison Burg Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?