In the matter of:Landin Marine Towing, LLC
Petitioner: Landin Marine Towing, LLC
Claimant: C. F. Bean, L.L.C. and Daigle Towing Service, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01080
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Eldon E Fallon
2 Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
3 Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:0185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: ORDERED that Civil Action 20-1080 is consolidated with Civil Action 20-994. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 05/06/2020.(ko)
April 30, 2020 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Answer and Claim to Complaint. **Document does not contain Section and Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section T and Magistrate (2).** (mm)
April 29, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint by Daigle Towing Service, L.L.C. Attorney Robert R. Johnston added to party Daigle Towing Service, L.L.C.(pty:clm).(Johnston, Robert)
April 16, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER AND CLAIM to #1 Complaint by C. F. Bean, LLC. Attorney Andre J. Mouledoux added to party C. F. Bean, LLC(pty:clm).(Mouledoux, Andre)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING THE ISSUANCE OF NOTICE TO CLAIMANTS AND RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 04/08/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Claimants)(ko)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Judge Eldon E. Fallon, Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/3/2020.(jeg)(NEF: Sections L and T; Magistrates 2 and 3)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Related Case(s) by Landin Marine Towing, LLC of related case(s) 20-cv-01088, 20-cv-01089, 20-cv-00994. (Cambre, Colin)
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 **ERROR. Attachments Filed Separately. See Doc. 1.**NOTICE by Landin Marine Towing, LLC Proposed Order for Issuance of Notice to Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Claimants)(Cambre, Colin) Modified on 4/2/2020 (pp).
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Exoneration or Limitation(Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8242956) filed by Landin Marine Towing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Letter of Undertaking, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Colin B. Cambre added to party Landin Marine Towing, LLC(pty:pet).(Cambre, Colin) Modified text on 4/2/2020 (pp). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/2/2020: #5 Proposed Order, #6 Notice to Claimants) (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the matter of:Landin Marine Towing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Landin Marine Towing, LLC
Represented By: Colin B. Cambre
Represented By: Thomas Kent Ledyard Morrison
Represented By: Taylor Michael Bologna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: C. F. Bean, L.L.C.
Represented By: Daniel J. Hoerner
Represented By: Andre J. Mouledoux
Represented By: Trevor Matthew Cutaiar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Daigle Towing Service, L.L.C.
Represented By: Constance C Waguespack
Represented By: Kristin Kay Robbins
Represented By: Robert R. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?