Ellis v. Drive New Jersey Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: John Ellis
Defendant: Radius Moving and Storage, Drive New Jersey Insurance Company and Juan Roman
Case Number: 2:2020cv01099
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Status Conference set for 6/17/2020 03:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon by telephone. Jury Trial set for 2/1/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. All discovery must be completed by 12/18/2020. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Issued for the Court by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(ko)
April 8, 2020 Filing 9 PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE: A PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE will be held BY TELEPHONE on THURSDAY, MAY 7, 2020, at 10:30AM, for the purpose of scheduling a pre-trial conference and trial on the merits and for a discussion of the status and discovery cut-off dates. Please use the following information to call in for the conference: Dial: 888-557-8511 Access code: 6655019 By Clerk.(jeg)
April 7, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand Answer to Petition for Damages by Radius Moving and Storage, Juan Roman. Attorney Nat Gerard Kiefer, Jr added to party Radius Moving and Storage(pty:dft), Attorney Nat Gerard Kiefer, Jr added to party Juan Roman(pty:dft).(Kiefer, Nat) Modified text on 4/8/2020 (jeg).
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Justin Reese of Petition for Damages served on Juan Roman, Radius Moving and Storage, Drive New Jersey Insurance Company on 3/17/2020. (King, Brian)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 Request by Drive New Jersey Insurance Company for Reasonable Notice of Surgery (Kiefer, Nat)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Drive New Jersey Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Progressive Corporation, Corporate Parent Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc. for Drive New Jersey Insurance Company (Kiefer, Nat)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Compliance Under 28 U.S.C 1447(b) by Drive New Jersey Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Kiefer, Nat)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Petition for Damages with Jury Demand by Drive New Jersey Insurance Company.(Kiefer, Nat) Modified text on 4/3/2020 (jeg).
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2019-13175 Div A Sec 16 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8244931) filed by Drive New Jersey Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit- State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 State Court Pleadings, #7 Affidavit)Attorney Nat Gerard Kiefer, Jr added to party Drive New Jersey Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Kiefer, Nat) Modified text on 4/3/2020 (jeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. Drive New Jersey Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radius Moving and Storage
Represented By: Megan C. Kiefer
Represented By: Nat Gerard Kiefer, Jr.
Represented By: Amanda Gammon Morse
Represented By: Christopher M Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drive New Jersey Insurance Company
Represented By: Nat Gerard Kiefer, Jr.
Represented By: Megan C. Kiefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Roman
Represented By: Megan C. Kiefer
Represented By: Nat Gerard Kiefer, Jr.
Represented By: Amanda Gammon Morse
Represented By: Christopher M Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ellis
Represented By: Jason F. Giles
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Milazzo, III
Represented By: Justin Anthony Reese
Represented By: Brian King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?