Mills v. Manson Construction Co.
Plaintiff: David S Mills and David Mills
Defendant: Manson Construction Co. and ABC Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01103
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
2 Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 00 U.S.C. ยง 0000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING #37 Motion to Dismiss Case. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the above entitled and numbered civil action is hereby dismissed with prejudice, with each party to pay his or its own costs. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 3/19/2021. (sa)
January 25, 2021 Filing 37 EXPARTE/CONSENT JOINT MOTION to Dismiss by David Mills, Manson Construction Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McLeod, Evans)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER - The District Judge has issued an Order of Dismissal at Rec. Doc. #35 ; Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the Settlement conference set before me on January 5, 2021 is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 1/4/2021.(sa)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 12/30/2020.(ko)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that a Settlement Conference is scheduled for TUESDAY, JANUARY 5, 2021, at 2:00 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. At least two (2) full business days before the conference, each party shall provide a confidential, concise position letter or memorandum to Chambers via email. It is the duty of the parties to notify my Chambers if this case is continued, settled, or otherwise disposed of prior to the date of the scheduled settlement conference. If an in-person conference is not advisable by JANUARY 5, 2021, the conference will be conducted via video-conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 12/7/2020. (NEF: Section T) (sa)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for the plaintiff contact the assigned magistrate judge six weeks prior to the pretrial conference of this matter currently scheduled January 7, 2021, for the purpose of scheduling a settlement conference which should be held no less than two weeks prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Issued for the Court by Clerk.(ko)
November 23, 2020 Filing 32 Witness List by Manson Construction Co.. (Warner, Justin)
November 23, 2020 Filing 31 Exhibit List by Manson Construction Co.. (Warner, Justin)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING #27 Motion to Withdraw as to #23 MOTION to Compel filed by Manson Construction Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 11/6/2020. (sa)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - Defendant has advised the Court that #23 Motion to Compel is now moot. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion to Compel is DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 11/6/2020. (sa)
November 6, 2020 Filing 28 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #27 MOTION to Withdraw Document re #23 MOTION to Compel. **Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the Magistrate Judge.** (mm)
November 6, 2020 Filing 27 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Document re #23 MOTION to Compel by Manson Construction Co. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McLeod, Evans) Modified text/added referral on 11/6/2020. Modified on 11/6/2020 (sa).
November 5, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Manson Construction Co. re 23 MOTION to Compel. (McLeod, Evans) Modified text on 11/5/2020 (mm). Modified on 11/6/2020 (sa).
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Expedite (ECF No. #24 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any Opposition Memoranda to Motion to Compel (ECF No. #23 ) be filed on or before 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, November 5, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Compel (ECF No. #23 ) shall be heard via video conference on Friday, November 6, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 11/4/2020.(sa)
November 3, 2020 Filing 24 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Motion to Compel re: rec. doc. 23 by Manson Construction Co. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(McLeod, Evans)
November 3, 2020 Filing 23 **WITHDRAWN** MOTION to Compel by Manson Construction Co. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Local Rule 37.1 Certificate, #4 Notice of Submission, #5 Proposed Order)(McLeod, Evans) Modified on 11/9/2020 (sa).
October 20, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Manson Construction Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Warner, Justin)
October 14, 2020 Filing 21 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #20 Witness List, Document does not contain Section and Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section T and Magistrate (2). (lt)
October 13, 2020 Filing 20 First Witness List by All Plaintiffs. (Daniel, David)
August 17, 2020 Filing 19 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Manson Construction Co., David Mills (Daniel, David)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Bench Trial set for 2/1/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. All discovery must be completed by 11/23/2020. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Issued for the Court by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF: Magistrate Judge)(ko)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown.(lag)
May 26, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/18/2020 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(ko)
May 1, 2020 Filing 15 DEFICIENT: SUMMONS Returned Executed; Manson Construction Co. served on 4/30/2020, answer due 5/21/2020. (Daniel, David) Modified text on 5/4/2020 (mm).
April 29, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Manson Construction Co. re #6 MOTION for a More Definite Statement. (mm)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum re: rec. doc. 6 by Manson Construction Co.. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 4/29/2020. (tjg)
April 28, 2020 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum re: rec. doc. 6 by Manson Construction Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Warner, Justin)
April 22, 2020 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Amendment/Supplement to Document. **Filing attorney should have attached this filing to record document 9. Clerk has correctly attached the filing to document 9. No further action is required.** (mm)
April 21, 2020 Filing 10 **ATTACHED CORRECTLY TO REC. DOC. 9** Amendment/Supplement to Document by David Mills re #9 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Exhibit #3 (Daniel, David) Modified text on 4/22/2020 (mm).
April 21, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by David Mills re #6 MOTION for a More Definite Statement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1, #2 Exhibit #2)(Daniel, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2020: #3 Exhibit 3) (mm).
April 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7.(mm)
April 15, 2020 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 MOTION for a More Definite Statement. **Filing attorney should have selected No at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Clerk took corrective action to set motion for submission on 4/29/2020 before Judge Guidry. No further action is necessary.** (mm)
April 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for a More Definite Statement by Manson Construction Co. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission) Attorney Justin Cole Warner added to party Manson Construction Co.(pty:dft).(Warner, Justin) Modified text/added submission date on 4/15/2020 (mm).
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. 1. **Corrected complaint was subsequently provided to Clerk. Clerk has attached to record document 1. 2. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the the summons and the civil cover sheet. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (mm)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7.(mm)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Manson Construction Co. (mm)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (aj)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 SEAMAN COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Prepayment of fee not required pursuant to 28 USC 1916) filed by David Mills. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) Attorney David Patrick Daniel, Jr added to party David Mills(pty:pla).(Daniel, David) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/6/2020) (mm). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/6/2020) (mm). (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/6/2020) (mm). Modified text on 4/6/2020 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mills v. Manson Construction Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manson Construction Co.
Represented By: Justin Cole Warner
Represented By: Evans Martin McLeod
Represented By: Magdalini Galitou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David S Mills
Represented By: David Patrick Daniel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Mills
Represented By: David Patrick Daniel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?