Moran Towing Corporation v. International-Matex Tank Terminals LLC
Plaintiff: Moran Towing Corporation
Defendant: International-Matex Tank Terminals LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01119
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE with Call-In Instructions. Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2020 10:00 AM before case manager, by telephone. (cbs)
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by International-Matex Tank Terminals LLC.Attorney Kelley A. Sevin added to party International-Matex Tank Terminals LLC(pty:dft).(Sevin, Kelley)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet and Summons. The pdf should not have the pink header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (cwa)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to International-Matex Tank Terminals LLC. (cwa)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (aj)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against International-Matex Tank Terminals LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8249662) filed by Moran Towing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Michael A Harowski added to party Moran Towing Corporation(pty:pla).(Harowski, Michael) (Attachments 1-2 replaced on 4/7/2020) (cwa). Modified on 4/7/2020 (cwa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moran Towing Corporation v. International-Matex Tank Terminals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moran Towing Corporation
Represented By: Michael A Harowski
Represented By: Katherine Wiarda Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International-Matex Tank Terminals LLC
Represented By: Kelley A. Sevin
Represented By: Elton Ford Duncan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?