Zacarias v. Travelers Indemnity Company et al
Plaintiff: Robert Zacarias
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company, Oticon, Inc. and Kimberly Ringer
Case Number: 2:2020cv01130
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Kimberly Ringer. Attorney Michael Robert Zsembik added to party Kimberly Ringer(pty:dft).(Zsembik, Michael)
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Oticon, Inc., Kimberly Ringer, Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(sbs)
May 14, 2020 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to Oticon, Inc., Kimberly Ringer, Travelers Indemnity Company filed by Robert Zacarias re #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Avin, John)
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Oticon, Inc., Kimberly Ringer, Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(sbs)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number ALAEDC-8251211) filed by Robert Zacarias. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney John Benjamin Avin added to party Robert Zacarias(pty:pla).(Avin, John) Modified text on 4/7/2020 (sbs). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/7/2020) (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zacarias v. Travelers Indemnity Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Zacarias
Represented By: John Benjamin Avin
Represented By: Anthony D. Irpino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oticon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Ringer
Represented By: Michael Robert Zsembik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?