Chauvin v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Joseph C. Chauvin
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2020cv01132
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 00:0000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Life Insurance Company of North America.Attorney Lauren A. Welch added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft).(Welch, Lauren)
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Life Insurance Company of North America served on 4/11/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (Toledano, Reagan)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (am)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (aj)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Life Insurance Company of North America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8251373) filed by Joseph C. Chauvin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Reagan Levert Toledano added to party Joseph C. Chauvin(pty:pla).(Toledano, Reagan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chauvin v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Lauren A. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph C. Chauvin
Represented By: Reagan Levert Toledano
Represented By: James Frederick Willeford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?