Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America v. DealerCMO, Inc
Plaintiff: ADVANTA-STAR AUTOMOTIVE RESEARCH CORPORATION OF AMERICA
Defendant: DealerCMO, Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01150
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Summons Returned Unexecuted. **Document filed in error. See rec doc. 11 for correct entry. No further action is necessary.** (mm)
June 2, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to DealerCMO, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Clark, William)
June 2, 2020 Filing 10 **FILED IN ERROR-SEE REC. DOC. 11 FOR CORRECT ENTRY** Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Dealer CMO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Clark, William) Modified text on 6/2/2020 (mm).
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SHOW CAUSE ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff show good cause in writing within 20 days why defendant DealerCMO, Inc. should not be dismissed for failure to serve in accordance with Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as stated herein. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/2/2020.(mm)
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **1. Document lists counsel of record, Stephen M. Dorvee and Morgan E.M. Harrison, for a party in this action who have not been admitted to practice in this court. Any party not appearing in proper person must be represented by a member of the bar of this court (L.R. 83.2.4). Please see Local Rule 83.2.2 for this courts Procedures for Admission and Local Rule 83.2.5 for Visiting Attorneys to appear and participate Pro Hac Vice. Filings which list attorneys not admitted pursuant to LR 83.2.2 or 83.2.5 will not be accepted. 2. Document does not contain Section and Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section R and Magistrate 3.** (mm)
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America (Clark, William) Modified text on 4/20/2020 (mm).
April 16, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to DealerCMO, Inc. (mm)
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #2 Complaint. **1. Filing attorney did not include local counsel's signature block on the complaint that was efiled. A corrected complaint was subsequently provided to Clerk and has now been attached as the main document in rec doc. 2. 2. Attachment 1 had duplicate description. For attachments, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. 3. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the civil cover sheet. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. 4. The Corporate Disclosure Statement filed at attachment 7 should not have been attached to the complaint. It should be refiled as a separate document.** (mm)
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to DealerCMO, Inc filed by Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America re #2 Complaint. (Clark, William) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/16/2020) (mm).
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with jury demand against DealerCMO, Inc (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8254590) filed by Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Disclosure) Attorney William Scarth Clark added to party Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America(pty:pla).(Clark, William) (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/16/2020) (mm). Modified text on 4/16/2020 (mm). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/16/2020) (mm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2020: #8 AO 121 Form) (mm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2020: #9 AO 121 Form) (mm).
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 Case Filing Fee Not Paid. The mandated filing fee of $$400.00 has not been paid. If payment is not received within two business days, the matter will be referred to the assigned judge. (go)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America v. DealerCMO, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVANTA-STAR AUTOMOTIVE RESEARCH CORPORATION OF AMERICA
Represented By: William Scarth Clark
Represented By: Peter Stephan Koeppel
Represented By: Megan Brooke Jacqmin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DealerCMO, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?