In Re: R360 Environmental Solutions of Louisiana, LLC et al
Petitioner: R360 Environmental Solutions of Louisiana, LLC and US Liquids of Louisiana, L.P.
Claimant: REC Marine Logistics, LLC, Danos Deepwater Vessels, LLC and Leon Freeman
Case Number: 2:2020cv01161
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
2 Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
3 Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30504
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES - Case No. 20-1161 consolidated with Case No. 19-13626. Cases associated: Create association to 2:19-cv-13626-MVL-DMD. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 6/1/2020.(sbs)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 6/1/2020. (sbs)
May 29, 2020 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Order Noting Default by R360 Environmental Solutions of Louisiana, LLC, US Liquids of Louisiana, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Mahtook, Robert) Modified text on 6/1/2020 (sbs).
May 29, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #9 Claim of Danos Deepwater Vessels, LLC and REC Marine Logistics, LLC by R360 Environmental Solutions of Louisiana, LLC, US Liquids of Louisiana, L.P. (Mahtook, Robert) Modified text, added link on 6/1/2020 (sbs).
May 28, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #8 Claim of Leon Freeman by R360 Environmental Solutions of Louisiana, LLC, US Liquids of Louisiana, L.P.(Mahtook, Robert) Modified text, added link on 5/29/2020 (sbs).
May 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Publication of Legal Notice by R360 Environmental Solutions of Louisiana, LLC, US Liquids of Louisiana, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mahtook, Robert) Modified text on 5/29/2020 (sbs).
May 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2020 at 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(sbs)
May 15, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint, by Danos Deepwater Vessels, LLC, REC Marine Logistics, LLC. Attorney Salvador Joseph Pusateri added to party Danos Deepwater Vessels, LLC(pty:clm), Attorney Salvador Joseph Pusateri added to party REC Marine Logistics, LLC(pty:clm).(Pusateri, Salvador) Modified text on 5/18/2020 (sbs).
May 12, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint, by Leon Freeman. Attorney Natalie M. Morris added to party Leon Freeman(pty:clm).(Morris, Natalie)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER APPROVING PETITIONERS' AD INTERIM STIPULATION FOR VALUE AND DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE AND RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 4/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Claimants)(sbs)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Judge Lance M Africk, Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on April 14, 2020.(mp)
April 13, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Related Case(s) by R360 Environmental Solutions of Louisiana, LLC, US Liquids of Louisiana, L.P. of related case(s) 2:19-cv-13626. (Mahtook, Robert)
April 9, 2020 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #2 Notice. The Proposed Order was incorrectly filed as a separate document instead of as an attachment with the initial filing. Clerk took corrective action by attaching the Proposed Order to Rec. Doc. 1. No further action is needed. (mp)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (go)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 ***FILED IN ERROR - See Rec. Doc. 1: NOTICE by R360 Environmental Solutions of Louisiana, LLC, US Liquids of Louisiana, L.P. re #1 Complaint, Order Approving Petitioners' Ad Interim Stipulation for Value and Directing Issuance of Notice and Restraining Prosecution of Claims. (Mahtook, Robert) Modified on 4/9/2020 (mp).
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Parties (Fee previously paid) filed by R360 Environmental Solutions of Louisiana, LLC, US Liquids of Louisiana, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration of Value, #3 Ad Interim Stipulation, #4 Notice to Claimants, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Robert A. Mahtook, Jr added to party R360 Environmental Solutions of Louisiana, LLC(pty:selreq), Attorney Robert A. Mahtook, Jr added to party US Liquids of Louisiana, L.P.(pty:selreq).(Mahtook, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/9/2020: #6 Proposed Order) (mp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: R360 Environmental Solutions of Louisiana, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: R360 Environmental Solutions of Louisiana, LLC
Represented By: Julie I. Faulk
Represented By: Robert A. Mahtook, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: US Liquids of Louisiana, L.P.
Represented By: Julie I. Faulk
Represented By: Robert A. Mahtook, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: REC Marine Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Belle McIntosh
Represented By: Salvador Joseph Pusateri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Danos Deepwater Vessels, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Belle McIntosh
Represented By: Salvador Joseph Pusateri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Leon Freeman
Represented By: Darren David Sumich
Represented By: Andrew J. Cvitanovic
Represented By: Philip Francis Cossich, Jr.
Represented By: Natalie M. Morris
Represented By: Brandon J. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?