Thompson v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Leland W Thompson
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01164
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2021 02:30 PM before Judge Carl Barbier. Jury Trial set for 6/21/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Carl Barbier. All discovery must be completed by 4/27/2021. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 6/2/20. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(cg)
May 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/2/2020 02:30 PM before case manager by telephone. Counsel must call into the conference at (877) 848-7030, Access Code 2704006. By Clerk. (gec)
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Chassaignac, Charles)
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Chassaignac, Charles)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Answer due 5/7/2020. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 4/13/20. (cg)
April 13, 2020 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chassaignac, Charles)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (go)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company of List of Parties, Copies of Pleadings and Service in Compliance with 28 USC Section 1447 (b). (Chassaignac, Charles) (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/9/2020) (cg).
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court Jefferson Parish, case number 804-159 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8255652) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Charles L. Chassaignac, IV added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Chassaignac, Charles) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/9/2020) (cg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles L. Chassaignac, IV
Represented By: Eleanor Weeks Wall
Represented By: Justin Murphy DeLaune
Represented By: Emily Stickney Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leland W Thompson
Represented By: Lee J. Amedee, III
Represented By: Christopher G. McNeil
Represented By: Andre P. Gauthier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?