Whalen et al v. Morice et al
Plaintiff: Ladner's Industries, Sarah A Whalen, Theodore Ladner, Theodore A Lander, Jr, Ted Lander and Lander's Industries Co.
Defendant: City of New Orleans Police Department, Gerald A. Turlich, Jr., Mark E. Morice, Roger Caillouet, Ty Wiltz, Keith J Lobrono, Network Strategist, Hammel Law Firm LLC, Continental Casualty Company, Inc., Morice Law Firm LLC, Douglas Stephen Hammel, Morice Law Firm, LLC, Continental Casualty Company, Gilsbar, L.L.C., New Orleans City, Douglas S Hammel and Keith Lobrono
Case Number: 2:2020cv01265
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Mark E. Morice on 4/28/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Morice, Mark)
May 27, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Morice Law Firm, LLC on 4/28/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Morice, Mark)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Gerald A. Turlich, Jr, Ty Wiltz.Attorney Daniel Rault Martiny added to party Gerald A. Turlich, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Rault Martiny added to party Ty Wiltz(pty:dft).(Martiny, Daniel)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Roger Caillouet, Continental Casualty Company, Gilsbar LLC, Douglas S Hammel, Hammel Law Firm LLC, Keith Lobrono, Mark E. Morice, Morice Law Firm LLC, Network Strategist, New Orleans City, Gerald A. Turlich, Jr, Ty Wiltz. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(pp)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (go)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Attachments: #1 Summons Network, #2 Summons Lobrono, #3 Summons Morice Law Firm, #4 Summons Morice, #5 Summons Caillouet, #6 Summons Hammel Law Firm, #7 Summons Hammel, #8 Summons Wiltz, #9 Summons Continental, #10 Summons Gilsbar, #11 Summons City Of New Orleans, #12 Summons Turlich, #13 Exhibit 1, #14 Exhibit 2, #15 Exhibit 3, #16 Exhibit 4, #17 Exhibit 5, #18 Affidavit Verification Whalen, #19 Affidavit Verification Ladner, #20 Affidavit Verification Ladner Co)(Rumage, Joseph)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Roger Caillouet, City of New Orleans Police Department, Continental Casualty Company, Inc., Douglas Stephen Hammel, Hammel Law Firm LLC, Keith J Lobrono, Mark E. Morice, Morice Law Firm LLC, Network Strategist, Gerald A. Turlich, Jr, Ty Wiltz (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8271769) filed by Sarah A Whalen, Ladner's Industries, Theodore Ladner.Attorney Joseph Paul Rumage, Jr added to party Theodore Ladner(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph Paul Rumage, Jr added to party Ladner's Industries(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph Paul Rumage, Jr added to party Sarah A Whalen(pty:pla).(Rumage, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whalen et al v. Morice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New Orleans Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald A. Turlich, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey David Martiny
Represented By: Daniel Rault Martiny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark E. Morice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Caillouet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Wiltz
Represented By: Jeffrey David Martiny
Represented By: Daniel Rault Martiny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith J Lobrono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Network Strategist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hammel Law Firm LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morice Law Firm LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Stephen Hammel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morice Law Firm, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilsbar, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas S Hammel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Lobrono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ladner's Industries
Represented By: Joseph Paul Rumage, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah A Whalen
Represented By: Joseph Paul Rumage, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Ladner
Represented By: Joseph Paul Rumage, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore A Lander, Jr
Represented By: Joseph Paul Rumage, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted Lander
Represented By: Joseph Paul Rumage, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lander's Industries Co.
Represented By: Joseph Paul Rumage, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?