Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., et al v. International-Matex Tank Terminals LLC
Plaintiff: Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. and Energy Intelligence Group UK Limited
Defendant: International-Matex Tank Terminals LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01295
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/30/2020 09:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(ko)
June 16, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by International-Matex Tank Terminals LLC.(Lee, Andrew) Modified on 6/17/2020 (pp).
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Suzanna Morales, Robert L. Powley, James Martin Gibson, Stephen M Ankrom. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on June 1, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Visiting Attorneys) (mp)
May 29, 2020 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Stephen M. Ankrom (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8324823) by Energy Intelligence Group UK Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Executed ECF Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Szapary, Christophe)
May 29, 2020 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice James M. Gibson (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8324788) by Energy Intelligence Group UK Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Executed ECF Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Szapary, Christophe)
May 29, 2020 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert L. Powley (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8324762) by Energy Intelligence Group UK Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Executed ECF Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Szapary, Christophe)
May 29, 2020 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Suzanna M. M. Morales (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8324729) by Energy Intelligence Group UK Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Executed ECF Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Szapary, Christophe)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings re #1 Complaint, as to International-Matex Tank Terminals LLC. Responsive pleadings due by 6/16/2020. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on May 20, 2020. (mp)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REALLOTTING CASE. Judge Sarah S. Vance recused. Case reassigned to Judge Lance M Africk. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/20/2020.(mm) (NEF: DJ & MJ)
May 19, 2020 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Complaint by International-Matex Tank Terminals LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Andrew Russell Lee added to party International-Matex Tank Terminals LLC(pty:dft).(Lee, Andrew)
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; International-Matex Tank Terminals LLC served on 5/5/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Szapary, Christophe)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Request for Summons Issued. **1. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the summons. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. 2. Page 2 of summons not provided. For future filings, page 2 should be attached to page 1 of summons. Clerk has attached 2nd page of summons. Please use both pages when filing returns of service. No further action necessary.** (mm)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to International-Matex Tank Terminals LLC. (mm)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **1. The Corporate Disclosure Statement filed at attachment 2 should not have been filed as an attachment to the complaint. It should be refiled as a separate document. 2. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the civil cover sheet. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. 3. Attachments 3-6 had duplicate descriptions. For attachments, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to International-Matex Tank Terminals LLC filed by Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., Energy Intelligence Group UK Limited re #1 Complaint. (Szapary, Christophe) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/30/2020) (mm).
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against International-Matex Tank Terminals LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8280463) filed by Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., Energy Intelligence Group UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Statement Rule 7.1 Statement, #3 Exhibit A Dec 6, 2019 Registered OD Work, #4 Exhibit B OD Regs (July 2004-2020), #5 Exhibit C Oil Daily Dec 6, 2019 Transmission Email, #6 Exhibit D Courtney '19 NS Invoice) Attorney Christophe B. Szapary added to party Energy Intelligence Group UK Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Christophe B. Szapary added to party Energy Intelligence Group, Inc.(pty:pla).(Szapary, Christophe) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/30/2020) (mm). Modified text on 4/30/2020 (mm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2020: #7 AO 121 Form) (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., et al v. International-Matex Tank Terminals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Energy Intelligence Group, Inc.
Represented By: Christophe B. Szapary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Energy Intelligence Group UK Limited
Represented By: Christophe B. Szapary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International-Matex Tank Terminals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?