Celtic Marine Corporation v. Metal Partners International, LLC
Plaintiff: Celtic Marine Corporation
Defendant: METAL PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01471
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment to Re-file and Re-Urge by Celtic Marine Corporation. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Statement of Uncontested Material Facts, #9 Notice of Submission, #10 Proposed Order)(Cot, Jose) Modified text on 7/16/2020 (ajn).
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying without prejudice #7 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (jrc)
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Attachments have duplicate descriptions. For attachments, select either a category OR enter a description, selecting both will result in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. (cwa)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Celtic Marine Corporation. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - contract, #3 Exhibit B - invoices, #4 Exhibit C - letter to Metal Partners dated 2020 04 13, #5 Exhibit D - Declaration of Robert M. Bayham, Jr., #6 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #7 Notice of Submission, #8 Proposed Order Order)(Cot, Jose) Modified text on 6/22/2020 (cwa).
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Celtic Marine Corporation served on 5/21/2020, answer due 6/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Cot, Jose)
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 ***DEFICIENT*** AFFIDAVIT of Service by John Hurter of Complaint served on Metal Partners International on May 21, 20200. (Cot, Jose) Modified on 5/26/2020 (ajn).
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Celtic Marine Corporation (Cot, Jose)
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Metal Partners International, LLC. (ajn)
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8307973) filed by Celtic Marine Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Jose R. Cot added to party Celtic Marine Corporation(pty:pla).(Cot, Jose) Modified text on 5/19/2020 (ajn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Celtic Marine Corporation v. Metal Partners International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METAL PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celtic Marine Corporation
Represented By: Jose R. Cot
Represented By: Robert Kenton Denny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?