Dardar v Pit Stop Eatery of Houma, LLC
Plaintiff: Christina Dardar
Defendant: Pit Stop Eatery of Houma, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01605
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Pit Stop Eatery of Houma, LLC on 6/5/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Bergeron, Roy)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Summons Submitted for Issuance. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the summons. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (mm)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Pit Stop Eatery of Houma, LLC. (mm)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Bergeron, Roy) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/5/2020) (mm).
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pit Stop Eatery of Houma, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8333096) filed by Christina Dardar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Roy L. Bergeron, Jr added to party Christina Dardar(pty:pla).(Bergeron, Roy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dardar v Pit Stop Eatery of Houma, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Dardar
Represented By: Jimmy Simien
Represented By: Roy L. Bergeron, Jr.
Represented By: Eulis Simien, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pit Stop Eatery of Houma, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?