Koeppel v. Robinhood Markets, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Sidney Koeppel
Defendant: Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc. and Robinhood Securities, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01623
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice, all parties to bear their own respective costs. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 7/23/2020. (clc)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Sidney B. Koeppel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clark, William)
June 16, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Robinhood Markets, Inc. on 6/8/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Koeppel, Peter) Modified text on 6/16/2020 (clc).
June 16, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Robinhood Securities, LLC on 6/8/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Koeppel, Peter) Modified text on 6/16/2020 (clc).
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Robinhood Financial, LLC on 6/8/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Koeppel, Peter)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(am)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8334919) filed by Sidney Koeppel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)Attorney Peter Stephan Koeppel added to party Sidney Koeppel(pty:pla).(Koeppel, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koeppel v. Robinhood Markets, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Sidney Koeppel
Represented By: Peter Stephan Koeppel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?