C-Port, LLC v. Mobile Offshore Production Unit Ocean Patriot
Plaintiff: C-Port, LLC
Defendant: Mobile Offshore Production Unit Ocean Patriot
Case Number: 2:2020cv01630
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Susie Morgan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Filing 11 WARRANT Returned Executed as to Mobile Offshore Production Unit Ocean Patriot on 6/19/2020. (lag)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appoint/Substitute Custodian. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 6/16/2020. (sbs)
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Appointment of Substitute Custodian by C-Port, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Morrison, Thomas) Modified text on 6/16/2020 (sbs).
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 WARRANT of Arrest issued. (2CC: USM) (sbs)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Permit Movement of Vessel. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 6/8/2020. (sbs)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 6/8/2020. (sbs)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Morrison, Thomas)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
June 5, 2020 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8337300) (aj)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Mobile Offshore Production Unit Ocean Patriot. (Fee previously paid) filed by C-Port, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Morrison, Thomas) Modified text on 6/5/2020 (my).
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to Permit Movement of Vessel by C-Port, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morrison, Thomas) Modified event on 6/5/2020 (my).
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest in rem by C-Port, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)Attorney Thomas Kent Ledyard Morrison added to party C-Port, LLC(pty:pla).(Morrison, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C-Port, LLC v. Mobile Offshore Production Unit Ocean Patriot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C-Port, LLC
Represented By: Robert Perry McCleskey, Jr.
Represented By: Colin B. Cambre
Represented By: Thomas Kent Ledyard Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile Offshore Production Unit Ocean Patriot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?