Fabre v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Monafay L. Fabre
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv01644
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 6/29/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed- US Attorney, answer due 8/24/2020, #2 Summons Returned Executed/US AG, answer due 9/4/2020)(Breuer, Wiebke) Modified text on 8/3/2020 to add answer due dates (ajn).
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(pp)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8340901) filed by Monafay L. Fabre. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons US Attorney, #3 Summons SSA, #4 Summons US Attorney General)Attorney Wiebke Breuer added to party Monafay L. Fabre(pty:selreq).(Breuer, Wiebke) Modified text on 6/9/2020 (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fabre v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monafay L. Fabre
Represented By: Wiebke Breuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?