Ferdinand v. Spears Consulting Group, LLC
Plaintiff: HEATHER FERDINAND
Defendant: SPEARS CONSULTING GROUP, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01765
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Spears Consulting Group, LLC served on 8/4/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (Wilson, Whitney)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Spears Consulting Group, LLC. (am)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Wilson, Whitney)
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. The memo in support for the application for temporary restraining order should be filed as an attachment to the a motion along with a notice of submission. The motion should be set for submission before the magistrate judge.** (am)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8364264) filed by Heather Ferdinand. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Memorandum in Support)Attorney Ravi K. Sangisetty added to party Heather Ferdinand(pty:pla).SERVICE BY WAIVER(Sangisetty, Ravi) Modified text on 6/22/2020 (am). (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/22/2020) (am). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2020: #5 AO 121 Form) (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferdinand v. Spears Consulting Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATHER FERDINAND
Represented By: Ravi K. Sangisetty
Represented By: Whitney Morgan Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPEARS CONSULTING GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?