Carr v. Progressive Gulf Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Michael Carr
Defendant: Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, MC Conveyors and Maintenance, LLC, Jeffery Reilly and Jeffery A. Reilly
Consolidated Plaintiff: Scope Services, Inc. and Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01796
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Scope Services, Inc. (Reference: 20-1814)(McCauley, Deanne)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company identifying Corporate Parent Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Corporate Parent Starr Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Starr International Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Starr Global Financial, Inc., Corporate Parent Starr Global Holdings AG for Starr Indemnity & Liability Company (Reference: 20-1796 and 20-1814)(McCauley, Deanne)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that CA 20-1796 is consolidated with CA 20-1814. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 07/20/2020.(ko)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (ess)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Reasonable Notice of Surgery by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company for (Kiefer, Nat) Modified text on 6/25/2020 (pp).
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Progressive Casualty Insurance Company for Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Kiefer, Nat)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Compliance by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,,. (Kiefer, Nat)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company.(Kiefer, Nat) Modified on 6/25/2020 (pp).
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 24th JDC for the Parish of Jefferson, case number 806-252 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8371824) filed by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Certificate of Filing State Court Record)Attorney Nat Gerard Kiefer, Jr added to party Progressive Gulf Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Kiefer, Nat)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carr v. Progressive Gulf Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Gulf Insurance Company
Represented By: Nat Gerard Kiefer, Jr.
Represented By: Megan C. Kiefer
Represented By: Amanda Gammon Morse
Represented By: Christopher M Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MC Conveyors and Maintenance, LLC
Represented By: Nat Gerard Kiefer, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher M Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery A. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Carr
Represented By: Louis Adam Gerdes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Scope Services, Inc.
Represented By: Paul J. Politz
Represented By: Deanne B. McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Represented By: Paul J. Politz
Represented By: Deanne B. McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?