Thompson v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Theresa Thompson
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv01843
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Social Security Response Order: Plaintiff's BRIEF is due within 40 days after the defendant has filed its answer. Defendant's REPLY BRIEF is due within 45 days after the plaintiff's brief is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on July 27, 2020. (cc: AUSA)(mp)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 NOTICE. **Notice was filed into the incorrect case. Please disregard**. (mp)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 ***Filed In Incorrect Case*** NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7.(mp) Modified on 7/16/2020 (mp).
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(sent to Plaintiff via USPS w/ cc Pauper Order, Pauper Letter, & Complaints)(mp)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court WITHDRAW the deficiency associated with the #2 application and affidavit to proceed in forma pauperis, and that the application be ACCEPTED into the record. The plaintiff shall abide by the guidelines provided in the #3 Deficiency Notice for all future filings in this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on July 15, 2020. (mp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2020: #1 Pauper Letter) (mp).
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 7/21/2020. (am)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Theresa Thompson. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (am)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Theresa Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(am) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2020: #2 Exhibit) (am). (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/30/2020) (am). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2020: #3 Envelope) (am). Removed deficiency on 7/16/2020 per #4 Order (mp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?