Simon v. Larpenter
Plaintiff: Jansen Michael Simon
Defendant: Jerry Larpenter, Dontrell Steele, Brody Fanguy and Stephen Bergeron
Case Number: 2:2020cv01854
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Defendants, Stephen Bergeron, Brody Fanguy, Jerry Larpenter, and Dontrell Steele. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and the Defendants are given an extension of time to answer or respond to the Complaint by September 11, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 8/21/2020. (sa)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Stephen Bergeron, Brody Fanguy, Jerry Larpenter, Dontrell Steele. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney William F. Dodd added to party Stephen Bergeron(pty:dft), Attorney William F. Dodd added to party Brody Fanguy(pty:dft), Attorney William F. Dodd added to party Jerry Larpenter(pty:dft), Attorney William F. Dodd added to party Dontrell Steele(pty:dft).(Dodd, William) Modified text on 8/21/2020 (jls).
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Stephen Bergeron, Brody Fanguy, Jerry Larpenter, and Dontrell Steele served on 7/22/2020, answers due 8/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Return - Larpenter, #2 Summons Return - Bergeron, #3 Summons Return - Fanguy)(jls)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - By Order dated June 6, 2020 (ECF No. #4 ), I granted Plaintiff's First Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. ECF No. #2 . Accordingly; IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Second Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (ECF No. #7 ), is DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 7/23/2020. (sa)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 Response/Reply by Jansen Michael Simon to #6 1983 Response Order (jls)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jansen Michael Simon. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Original Deficient Motion)(jls)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 1983 Response Order that plaintiff file statement of facts, exhibit and witness list by AUGUST 7, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 7/8/2020.(sa)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Stephen Bergeron, Brody Fanguy, Jerry Larpenter, Dontrell Steele. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(caa)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAUPER ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with a partial payment of $10.39 and directing the remainder of filing fee be made from Prisoner Account as to Jansen Michael Simon in monthly payments as set out in document. Clerk is instructed to terminate the deficiency assigned to Record Document No. 2 for purposes of entering this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 7/6/2020. (cc: Warden, USM, Fin)(caa)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 7/23/2020. (jls)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jansen Michael Simon. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (jls) Modified on 7/6/2020 (caa).
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stephen Bergeron, Brody Fanguy, Jerry Larpenter, Dontrell Steele filed by Jansen Michael Simon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon v. Larpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Larpenter
Represented By: William F. Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dontrell Steele
Represented By: William F. Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brody Fanguy
Represented By: William F. Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Bergeron
Represented By: William F. Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jansen Michael Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?