Scott v. Kent et al
Plaintiff: Ben Henry Scott
Defendant: Jason Kent
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2020cv01889
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:20-cv-00183. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (dw)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order . Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (LT) [Transferred from lamd on 7/2/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 7/1/2020. (LT) [Transferred from lamd on 7/2/2020.]
May 4, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Amend #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 7/2/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Supplement Petition/Order to Rule Moot Petitioner's Original Motion to Amend by Ben Henry Scott. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 7/2/2020.]
April 1, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 7/2/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Ben Henry Scott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 7/2/2020.] Modified on 7/2/2020- motion reopened (dw).
March 23, 2020 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 7/2/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Ben H. Scott. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment, #3 Cover Letter)(KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 7/2/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Kent et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Henry Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?