Hill v. GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Neshandra Hill
Defendant: ServPro of the New Orleans Westbank and GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01896
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Defendant's #4 MOTION to Administratively Close Case Pending Appraisal, scheduled for submission on 8/5/2020, is continued to 9/2/2020. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 8/3/2020.(sbs)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Neshandra Hill re #4 MOTION to Administratively Close Case Pending Appraisal. (Moss, Trent)
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by Neshandra Hill. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Moss, Trent) Modified text on 7/29/2020 (sbs).
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Rug Busters, Inc. Attorney Troy A. Broussard added to party Rug Busters, Inc.(pty:dft).(Broussard, Troy) Modified text and filer on 7/23/2020 (sbs).
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Geovera Holdings, Inc. for GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company (Reimonenq, Simeon)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE: Because R. Doc. #4 contains more than 50 pages, counsel shall mail to chambers within 3 working days one hard copy of the submission in a binder as set forth in notice. Signed by Clerk.(sbs)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Administratively Close Case Pending Appraisal by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 1-A, #4 Exhibit 1-B, #5 Exhibit 1-C, #6 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #7 Notice of Submission)(Reimonenq, Simeon) Modified text on 7/9/2020 (sbs).
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company.(Reimonenq, Simeon)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2020-03133 "F-7" (Filing fee $400 receipt number ALAEDC-8385845) filed by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Notice of Compliance, #7 Supplement Listing, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Simeon B. Reimonenq, Jr added to party GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Reimonenq, Simeon) Modified text on 7/6/2020 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ServPro of the New Orleans Westbank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Simeon B. Reimonenq, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neshandra Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?