Karl v. Sanofi U.S. Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gloria Karl
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC separately and doing business as Winthrop U.S.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01901
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(am)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:20-cv-07485. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (ecm)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-58) transferring case to the USDC for the LAED. (dm ) [Transferred from njd on 7/16/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER ORDER granting Defendants request for the Court to adjourn the 07/23/2020 Initial Conference and related Rule 26 deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 07/14/2020. (jmh) [Transferred from njd on 7/16/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Stephen C. Matthews re Adjournment of Initial Conference. (MATTHEWS, STEPHEN) [Transferred from njd on 7/16/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 7/23/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert will be held via telephone. (Attachment: Conference call instructions. Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 JDP Instructions) (ce3) [Transferred from njd on 7/16/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Judge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr ) [Transferred from njd on 7/16/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SANOFI U.S. SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (MATTHEWS, STEPHEN) [Transferred from njd on 7/16/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI U.S. SERVICES INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Middlesex County, case number MID-L-003619-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10967143), filed by SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI U.S. SERVICES INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State documents), #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(MATTHEWS, STEPHEN) [Transferred from njd on 7/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karl v. Sanofi U.S. Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Harley Victor Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Harley Victor Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC separately and doing business as Winthrop U.S.
Represented By: Harley Victor Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Karl
Represented By: John Christopher Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?