Elevating Boats LLC v. I.G. Petroleum, LLC
Plaintiff: Elevating Boats LLC
Defendant: I.G. Petroleum, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02011
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by I.G. Petroleum, LLC (Waguespack, David)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Elevating Boats LLC (Best, Mark)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE: A PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE will be held BY TELEPHONE on TUESDAY, SEPTEMBER 22, 2020, at 11:00AM, for the purpose of scheduling a pre-trial conference and trial on the merits and for a discussion of the status and discovery cut-off dates. Please use the following information to call in for the conference: Dial: 888-557-8511 Access code: 6655019. By Clerk.(jeg)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by I.G. Petroleum, LLC.(Waguespack, David)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to I.G. Petroleum, LLC answer due 8/31/2020. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/11/2020. (jeg)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by I.G. Petroleum, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney David F. Waguespack added to party I.G. Petroleum, LLC(pty:dft).(Waguespack, David)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; I.G. Petroleum, LLC served on 7/17/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Best, Mark)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to I.G. Petroleum, LLC. (jeg)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (ess)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against I.G. Petroleum, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8403244) filed by Elevating Boats LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Mark Edward Best added to party Elevating Boats LLC(pty:pla).(Best, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elevating Boats LLC v. I.G. Petroleum, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.G. Petroleum, LLC
Represented By: David F. Waguespack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elevating Boats LLC
Represented By: Mark Edward Best
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?