KZM Marine, LLC v. Genesis Venture Logistics, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: KZM Marine, LLC
Defendant: Genesis Venture Trucking, LLC, Lorraine Hyde, Genesis Venture Logistics, LLC and NexGen Marine, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02012
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Martin LC Feldman
2 Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Genesis Venture Logistics, LLC Notice of Automatic Stay. (Brouphy, Greta)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. Judge Greg Gerard Guidry no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 07/21/2020.(ko)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the civil cover sheet. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (mm)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8403279) filed by KZM Marine, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Harry E. Morse added to party KZM Marine, LLC(pty:pla).(Morse, Harry) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/15/2020) (mm). Modified text on 7/15/2020 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KZM Marine, LLC v. Genesis Venture Logistics, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KZM Marine, LLC
Represented By: Martin S. Bohman
Represented By: Harry E. Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Venture Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorraine Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Venture Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NexGen Marine, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?