Eddie's Quality Oysters, Inc. v. Cain et al
Plaintiff: Eddie's Quality Oysters, Inc.
Defendant: Waterfront Seafood, Inc., Thomas Eugene Cain, Waterfront Fish House, Inc., Joseph Cain, Justin Thomas Cain and Norwood Cain
Case Number: 2:2020cv02028
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Thomas Eugene Cain. (lt)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 Request of Summons Issued as to Thomas Eugene Cain filed by Eddie's Quality Oysters, Inc. re #1 Complaint,,. (Dunbar, Corey)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Norwood Cain served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Dunbar, Corey)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Waterfront Seafood, Inc. served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Dunbar, Corey)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Waterfront Fish House, Inc. served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. (Dunbar, Corey)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Joseph Cain served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. (Dunbar, Corey)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Justin Thomas Cain served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. (Dunbar, Corey)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Joseph Cain, Justin Thomas Cain, Norwood Cain, Waterfront Fish House, Inc., Waterfront Seafood, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(jls)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8405707) filed by Eddie's Quality Oysters, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verification, #2 Exhibit A - Demand Letter and Invoices, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Justin Thomas Cain, #5 Summons Joseph Cain, #6 Summons Norwood O. Cain, #7 Summons Waterfront Seafood, Inc., #8 Summons Waterfront Fish House, Inc.)Attorney Corey E. Dunbar added to party Eddie's Quality Oysters, Inc.(pty:pla).(Dunbar, Corey) Modified text on 7/17/2020 (jls).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eddie's Quality Oysters, Inc. v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waterfront Seafood, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Eugene Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waterfront Fish House, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Thomas Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norwood Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie's Quality Oysters, Inc.
Represented By: Corey E. Dunbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?