American River Transportation Co., LLC v. Asia Pearl II M/V
Plaintiff: American River Transportation Co., LLC d/b/a ARTCO Stevedoring and American River Transportation Company, LLC doing business as ARTCO Stevedoring
Defendant: ASIA PEARL II M/V
Petitioner: Maritime Asia Pearl Pte Ltd
Case Number: 2:2020cv02035
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Bench Trial set for 6/2/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(jrc)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 9/14/2020 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Asia Pearl II M/V, Maritime Asia Pearl Pte Ltd..Attorney Peter Brooks Sloss added to party Asia Pearl II M/V(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Brooks Sloss added to party Maritime Asia Pearl Pte Ltd.(pty:dft).(Sloss, Peter)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Maritime Asia Pearl Pte Ltd. of Claim of Ownership of M/V ASIA PEARL II. (Sloss, Peter)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (ess)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ASIA PEARL II M/V (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8406969) filed by American River Transportation Co., LLC d/b/a ARTCO Stevedoring. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney David M. Flotte added to party American River Transportation Co., LLC d/b/a ARTCO Stevedoring(pty:pla).(Flotte, David) (WITHHOLD IN REM SERVICE) Modified on 7/20/2020 (ajn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American River Transportation Co., LLC v. Asia Pearl II M/V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASIA PEARL II M/V
Represented By: Peter Brooks Sloss
Represented By: Charles Lewis Whited, Jr.
Represented By: Tarryn Elizabeth Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American River Transportation Co., LLC d/b/a ARTCO Stevedoring
Represented By: David M. Flotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American River Transportation Company, LLC doing business as ARTCO Stevedoring
Represented By: David M. Flotte
Represented By: Marcelle P. Mouledoux
Represented By: Kevin M. Frey
Represented By: Austin Story Glascoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maritime Asia Pearl Pte Ltd
Represented By: Peter Brooks Sloss
Represented By: Charles Lewis Whited, Jr.
Represented By: Tarryn Elizabeth Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?