Schutt et al v. Allergan Inc, et al
Plaintiff: Brittany Schutt and Phillip Schutt
Defendant: ALLERGAN INC., Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan PLC, Allergan Inc and Inamed Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv02125
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Susie Morgan
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL. **Document to be refiled in correct case* (pp)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 Receipt of Transfer Case to the District of New Jersey (pp)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order of MDL Transfer to District of New Jersey. MDL case number is 2921. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(sbs)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2921. (sbs)
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 **ERROR-DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED IN CORRECT CASE**Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2804. (pp) Modified on 8/19/2020 (pp).
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Allergan Inc, Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(sbs)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to Allergan Inc, Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint. (Connick, John)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number ALAEDC-8417894) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney John Patrick Connick added to All Plaintiffs.(Connick, John) Modified text and filers on 7/27/2020 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schutt et al v. Allergan Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Schutt
Represented By: John Patrick Connick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Schutt
Represented By: John Patrick Connick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inamed Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?