4 Aces Enterprises LLC, et al v. John Bel Edwards, et al
Plaintiff: Marlee Celine, LLC d/b/a Murphy's, 4 Aces Enterprises LLC d/b/a 4 Aces Lounge, Dat Bar, L.L.C., The Outer Limits Bar, LLC, Longshotz 1, LLC d/b/a Longshotz, Jalw, LLC d/b/a The Break Room, JOM LLC d/b/a Just One More, Big Tyme Investments, LLC d/b/a Big Daddy's Pub & Grub, CD Enterprises of Houma LLC d/b/a Larussa's Lounge, R & J Lapeyrouse, LLC d/b/a Jeaux's New Horizon, The Boxer & The Barrel, LLC, Big Dan's Bar, Inc., K J's Place LLC, Double Hill Bar & Grill, LLC, PJSANCHEZ LLC d/b/a Cobalt Pete's, Judy's Nitecap, L.L.C., Tipsy Cajun, LLC, Tap Dat, L.L.C.d/b/a The Brass Monkey, Paradise Sports Bar & Daiquiris, LLC d/b/a Epic Lounge, Bottoms Up of Houma, R. Heasley, LLC d/b/a Ram Rod's Saloon, CKBCPB5 LLC d/b/a The Chatter Box, Boxer & the Barrel, LLC, Paradise Sports Bar & Daiquiris, LLC doing business as Epic Lounge, Tap Dat, LLC doing business as Brass Monkey, R&J Lapeyrouse, LLC doing business as Jeaux's New Horizon, Music Cove, LLC, Longshotz 1, LLC doing business as Longshotz, JALW, LLC doing business as Break Room, KJ's Place LLC, CD Enterprises of Houma LLC doing business as Larussa's Lounge, PJSanchez LLC doing business as Cobalt Pete's, R Heasley, LLC doing business as Ram Rod's Saloon, Outer Limits Bar, CKBCPB5 LLC doing business as Chatter Box, Big Tyme Investments, LLC doing business as Big Daddys Pub & Grub, JOM LLC doing business as Just One More, Marlee Celine, LLC doing business as Murphy's and 4 Aces Enterprises LLC doing business as 4 Aces Lounge
Defendant: John Bel Edwards, Fire Marshal H Butch Browning, Jr., H Browning, Jr and Butch Browning
Amicus Curiae: Dodie Horton, Phillip Tarver, Bob Hensgens, Ray Garofalo, Jr, Richard Nelson, Michael Echols, Jonathan Goudeau, Danny McCormick, Beryl Amadee, Larry Frieman, Rodney Schamerhorn, Paul Hollis, Raymond Crews, Ryan Bourriaque, Blake Miguez, Mark Wright, Julie Emerson, Phillip DeVillier, Alan Seabaugh, Bob Owen, Robert Mills, Sherman Mack, Charles Owen, Kathy Edmonston and Joseph Orgeron
Case Number: 2:2020cv02150
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 USCA Memorandum and Order as to #51 Notice of Appeal - IT IS ORDERED that the appellants' opposed motion to expedite this appeal is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the appellants' opposed motion to file appellants' brief without citation to the record on appeal, and then file a supplemental brief adding the citations after the record is filed is GRANTED. Issued by USCA Judge: JAMES C. HO. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(sa)
September 10, 2020 Filing 58 Electronic Record on Appeal Access Granted to Richard Frederick Norem, III, Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr, Mary Katherine Price, James M. Garner, Joshua Simon Force, Matthew F. Block re #51 Notice of Appeal,. USCA Case Number 20-30526. Instructions for access are posted on http://www.ca5.uscourts.gov/docs/default-source/forms/instructions-for-electronic-record-download-feature-of-cm.pdf (as)
September 2, 2020 Filing 57 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary and Permanent Injunction Hearing held on August 14, 2020 before Judge Martin L. C. Feldman. Court Reporter/Recorder Toni Tusa, Telephone number 504-589-7778. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/1/2020. (rsg
August 31, 2020 Filing 56 USCA Memorandum as to #51 Notice of Appeal - The court has granted the motion to consolidate cases 20-30526 (EDLA) and 20-30537 (LAWD). Issued by USCA Deputy Clerk. (sa)
August 27, 2020 Filing 55 USCA Case Number 20-30526 appealed to USCA, Fifth Circuit for #51 Notice of Appeal, filed by R Heasley, LLC, R&J Lapeyrouse, LLC, Outer Limits Bar, Tap Dat, LLC, Paradise Sports Bar & Daiquiris, LLC, JOM LLC, Longshotz 1, LLC, Big Tyme Investments, LLC, Music Cove, LLC, CD Enterprises of Houma LLC. (sa)
August 20, 2020 Filing 54 Defendant's Preliminary and Permanent Injunction Hearing Exhibits held on August 14, 2020 before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the attorneys in the case. The general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51)(cbs)
August 20, 2020 Filing 53 Plaintiffs' Original Preliminary and Permanent Injunction Hearing Exhibits held on August 14, 2020 before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. NOTE: This document will only be accessible to the attorneys in the case. The general public will NOT be able to view this document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Part 1, #2 Exhibit A, Part 2, #3 Exhibit A, Part 3, #4 Exhibit A, Part 4, #5 Exhibit A, Part 5, #6 Exhibit A, Part 6, #7 Exhibit A, Part 7, #8 Exhibit A, Part 8, #9 Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit C, Part 1, #11 Exhibit C, Part 2, #12 Exhibit C, Part 3, #13 Exhibit C, Part 4, #14 Exhibit C, Part 5, #15 Exhibit D, Part 1, #16 Exhibit D, Part 2, #17 Exhibit D, Part 3, #18 Exhibit D, Part 4, #19 Exhibit D, Part 5, #20 Exhibit D, Part 6, #21 Exhibit D, Part 8, #22 Exhibit D, Part 9, #23 Exhibit D, Part 10, #24 Exhibit E, #25 Exhibit F, #26 Exhibit G, #27 Exhibit H, #28 Exhibit I, #29 Exhibit J, #30 Exhibit K, #31 Exhibit L, #32 Exhibit M)(cbs) (Main Document 53 replaced on 8/20/2020) (cbs).
August 19, 2020 Filing 52 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Big Tyme Investments, LLC, CD Enterprises of Houma LLC, JOM LLC, Longshotz 1, LLC, Music Cove, LLC, Outer Limits Bar, Paradise Sports Bar & Daiquiris, LLC, R Heasley, LLC, R&J Lapeyrouse, LLC, Tap Dat, LLC for proceedings held on August 14, 2020 re #51 Notice of Appeal. (Transcript(s) ordered) (Court Reporter Toni Tusa noticed) (Faircloth, Jimmy) Modified text on 8/20/2020 (cwa).
August 18, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Big Tyme Investments, LLC, CD Enterprises of Houma LLC, JOM LLC, Longshotz 1, LLC, Music Cove, LLC, Outer Limits Bar, Paradise Sports Bar & Daiquiris, LLC, R Heasley, LLC, R&J Lapeyrouse, LLC, Tap Dat, LLC as to #50 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ALAEDC-8454574.) (Faircloth, Jimmy)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that the bar owners' #6 Motion for preliminary and permanent injunctive relief is DENIED, as set forth herein. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/17/2020. (sa)
August 17, 2020 Filing 47 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Big Tyme Investments, LLC, CD Enterprises of Houma LLC, JOM LLC, Longshotz 1, LLC, Music Cove, LLC, Outer Limits Bar, Paradise Sports Bar & Daiquiris, LLC, R Heasley, LLC, R&J Lapeyrouse, LLC, Tap Dat, LLC re #46 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File to File Supplemental Declaration of Dr. Alexander Billioux . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Faircloth, Jimmy)
August 16, 2020 Filing 46 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File to File Supplemental Declaration of Dr. Alexander Billioux by H Browning, Jr, John Bel Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 19, #4 Proposed Order)(Garner, James) Modified text on 8/17/2020 (cwa).
August 14, 2020 Filing 49 Preliminary and Permanent Injunction Hearing Exhibit List. (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Exhibit List)(cbs) (Main Document 49 replaced on 8/20/2020) (cbs).
August 14, 2020 Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman: Preliminary and Permanent Injunction Hearing held on 8/14/2020. Plaintiffs' #6 Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction is argued and taken under submission. (Court Reporter Toni Tusa.) (cbs)
August 14, 2020 Filing 45 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File to Add One Additional Exhibit to Exhibit List by H Browning, Jr, John Bel Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Garner, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2020: #5 Exhibit) (cwa).
August 14, 2020 Filing 44 Brief Amicus Curiae filed by Alan Seabaugh, et al (sa)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING #40 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/13/2020. (sa)
August 13, 2020 Filing 42 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Response to Amicus Curiae by H Browning, Jr, John Bel Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading)(Garner, James)
August 13, 2020 Filing 41 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Exhibit List by H Browning, Jr, John Bel Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Garner, James) Modified text/event on 8/14/2020 (cwa). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2020: #3 Proposed Pleading) (cwa).
August 13, 2020 Filing 40 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae by Alan Seabaugh, et al. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)Attorney Glenn Louis Langley added to party Alan Seabaugh, et al(pty:am).(Langley, Glenn) Modified text/submission date on 8/14/2020 (cwa).
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING #32 Motion to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record for attorney Jack M. Weiss for Defendants, H Browning, Jr and John Bel Edwards. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/13/2020. (sa)
August 13, 2020 Filing 38 Supplemental Authority in Support of #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, and #21 Reply to Response to Motion, by Big Tyme Investments, LLC, CD Enterprises of Houma LLC, Longshotz 1, LLC, Music Cove, LLC, Outer Limits Bar, Paradise Sports Bar & Daiquiris, LLC, R Heasley, LLC, R&J Lapeyrouse, LLC, Tap Dat, LLC. (sa)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING #31 Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Supplemental Authority. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/13/2020. (sa)
August 13, 2020 Filing 36 Supplemental Exhibit List as to #17 Witness and Exhibit List by H Browning, Jr, John Bel Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration)(sa)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING #29 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Witness & Exhibit Lists. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/13/2020. (sa)
August 13, 2020 Filing 34 Supplemental Memorandum as to #20 Proposed Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law, by Big Tyme Investments, LLC, CD Enterprises of Houma LLC, JOM LLC, Longshotz 1, LLC, Music Cove, LLC, Outer Limits Bar, Paradise Sports Bar & Daiquiris, LLC, R Heasley, LLC, R&J Lapeyrouse, LLC, Tap Dat, LLC. (sa)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING #27 Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Supplemental Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/13/2020. (sa)
August 13, 2020 Filing 32 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by H Browning, Jr, John Bel Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Garner, James)
August 13, 2020 Filing 31 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Supplemental Authority by Big Tyme Investments, LLC, CD Enterprises of Houma LLC, JOM LLC, Longshotz 1, LLC, Music Cove, LLC, Outer Limits Bar, Paradise Sports Bar & Daiquiris, LLC, R Heasley, LLC, R&J Lapeyrouse, LLC, Tap Dat, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Supplemental Authority, #2 Proposed Order)(Faircloth, Jimmy)
August 13, 2020 Filing 30 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #29 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Defendants' Witness List and Exhibit List for August 14, 2020 Hearing. (1) Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?. Exparte/Consent motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect Exparte and removed submission date. (2) Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the district judge. Clerk took corrective action. (3) Filing attorney did not select H Browning, Jr. as a filer. Clerk added filer. (cwa)
August 12, 2020 Filing 29 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Defendants' Witness List and Exhibit List for August 14, 2020 Hearing by John Bel Edwards, H Browning, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Proposed Order)(Garner, James) Modified text/referral/submission date/filers on 8/13/2020 (cwa).
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING #26 Motion for Leave to File Corrected Exhibit List. The Motion is GRANTED, and the Corrected Exhibit List will be attached to the previously filed document at Doc. #20 . Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/12/2020. (sa)
August 12, 2020 Filing 27 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File to File Plaintiffs' Supplemental Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Big Tyme Investments, LLC, CD Enterprises of Houma LLC, JOM LLC, Longshotz 1, LLC, Music Cove, LLC, Outer Limits Bar, Paradise Sports Bar & Daiquiris, LLC, R Heasley, LLC, R&J Lapeyrouse, LLC, Tap Dat, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Supplemental Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #3 Proposed Order)(Faircloth, Jimmy)
August 11, 2020 Filing 26 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Corrected Exhibit List Without Opposition by Big Tyme Investments, LLC, CD Enterprises of Houma LLC, JOM LLC, Longshotz 1, LLC, Music Cove, LLC, Outer Limits Bar, Paradise Sports Bar & Daiquiris, LLC, R Heasley, LLC, R&J Lapeyrouse, LLC, Tap Dat, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Corrected Exhibit List, #2 Proposed Order)(Faircloth, Jimmy)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion for Leave to File Exhibits 28 & 29 to the previously filed Memorandum in Opposition at Doc. #15 . Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/11/2020. (sa)
August 11, 2020 Filing 24 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #21 Reply to Response to Motion. Document was marked Deficient in error. Please disregard. (cbs)
August 11, 2020 Filing 23 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #22 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Exhibits to Defendant John Bel Edwards' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Requests for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the district judge. Clerk took corrective action. (cwa)
August 10, 2020 Filing 22 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Exhibits to Defendant John Bel Edwards' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Requests for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction by H Browning, Jr, John Bel Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Garner, James) Modified text/referral on 8/11/2020 (cwa).
August 10, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Big Tyme Investments, LLC, CD Enterprises of Houma LLC, JOM LLC, Longshotz 1, LLC, Music Cove, LLC, Outer Limits Bar, Paradise Sports Bar & Daiquiris, LLC, R Heasley, LLC, R&J Lapeyrouse, LLC, Tap Dat, LLC re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Faircloth, Jimmy) Modified on 8/11/2020 (cwa). Modified on 8/11/2020 (cbs).
August 10, 2020 Filing 20 Proposed Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by Big Tyme Investments, LLC, CD Enterprises of Houma LLC, JOM LLC, Longshotz 1, LLC, Music Cove, LLC, Outer Limits Bar, Paradise Sports Bar & Daiquiris, LLC, R Heasley, LLC, R&J Lapeyrouse, LLC, Tap Dat, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Proposed Order of Presentation and Witness List, #2 Plaintiffs' Exhibit List)(Faircloth, Jimmy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2020: #3 CORRECTED Exhibit List) (sa).
August 10, 2020 Filing 19 Proposed Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by H Browning, Jr, John Bel Edwards. (Garner, James)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorneys James M. Garner, Darnell Bludworth, Joshua Simon Force, Christopher Chocheles, and Josie Nicole Serigne for H Browning, Jr. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/10/2020. (sa)
August 10, 2020 Filing 17 Witness and Exhibit List by H Browning, Jr, John Bel Edwards. (Garner, James)
August 10, 2020 Filing 16 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #13 Notice of Appearance. (1) Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Motion to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record. Clerk took corrective action. (2) Motion and Order must be two separate PDF images, Motion is the main document and the order is an attachment. Clerk took corrective action. (3) Filing attorney incorrectly selected 4 Aces Enterprises LLC as a filer. Correct filer is H Browning, Jr. Clerk took corrective action. (cwa)
August 7, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by John Bel Edwards re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 17-A, #19 Exhibit 17-B, #20 Exhibit 17-C, #21 Exhibit 17-D, #22 Exhibit 17-E, #23 Exhibit 17-F, #24 Exhibit 17-G, #25 Exhibit 17-H, #26 Exhibit 17-I, #27 Exhibit 17-J, #28 Exhibit 17-K, #29 Exhibit 18, #30 Exhibit 19, #31 Exhibit 20, #32 Exhibit 21, #33 Exhibit 22, #34 Exhibit 23, #35 Exhibit 24, #36 Exhibit 25, #37 Exhibit 26, #38 Exhibit 27)(Garner, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/11/2020: #39 Exhibit 28, #40 Exhibit 29) (sa).
August 7, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Music Cove, LLC re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Faircloth, Jimmy)
August 7, 2020 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record. (Garner, James) (Main Document 13 replaced on 8/10/2020) (cwa). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2020: #1 Proposed Order) (cwa). Modified text/event/filers on 8/10/2020 (cwa).
August 7, 2020 Filing 12 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by The Music Cove, LLC (Faircloth, Jimmy)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law by 5:00 p.m. on August 10, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a document containing their proposed order of presentation by 5:00 p.m. on August 10, 2020. A copy of each exhibit shall be delivered to the Court by way of email to Jordan_Redmon@laed.uscourts.gov by 5:00 p.m. on August 12, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any witness or exhibit not included in the document will be excluded. Each side shall present only the evidence that is strictly necessary to prove their case. The presentations shall be limited to one hour per side. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/6/2020.(sa)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Longshotz 1, LLC, JOM LLC, Paradise Sports Bar & Daiquiris, LLC, R&J Lapeyrouse, LLC, Outer Limits Bar, CD Enterprises of Houma LLC, Big Tyme Investments, LLC, Tap Dat, LLC, R Heasley, LLC, The Music Cove, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint Verification Forms)Attorney Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr added to party The Music Cove, LLC(pty:pla).(Faircloth, Jimmy)
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to 4 Aces Enterprises LLC d/b/a 4 Aces Lounge, LLC; Bottoms Up of Houma; Dat Bar, L.L.C; Double Hill Bar & Grill, LLC; Jalw, LLC d/b/a The Break Room; Judy's NiteCap, L.L.C.; KJ's Place LLC; Marlee Celine, LLC d/b/a Murphy's; PJSANCHEZ LLC d/b/a Cobalt Pete's; The Boxer & the Barrel, LLC; Big Dan's Bar, Inc.; CKBCPB5 LLC d/b/a The Chatter Box; Tipsy Cajun, LLC by 4 Aces Enterprises LLC, Big Dan's Bar, Inc., Bottoms Up of Houma, Boxer & the Barrel, LLC, CKBCPB5 LLC, Dat Bar, L.L.C., Double Hill Bar & Grill, LLC, JALW, LLC, Judy's Nitecap, L.L.C., KJ's Place LLC, Marlee Celine, LLC, PJSanchez LLC, Tipsy Cajun, LLC. (Faircloth, Jimmy)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the August 14, 2020 preliminary injunction hearing is CONVERTED into a combined hearing on the plaintiffs' requests for preliminary and permanent injunctive relief. This order provides the parties the "clear and unambiguous notice" to which they are entitled. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/3/2020.(sa)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that #6 plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction is DENIED IN PART (insofar as it seeks a temporary restraining order) and DEFERRED IN PART (insofar as it seeks a preliminary injunction). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a preliminary injunction hearing is SET for August 14, 2020 at 1:30 P.M. Any opposition must be filed by August 7, 2020, and any reply must be filed by August 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 7/31/2020. (sa)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by 4 Aces Enterprises LLC, Big Dan's Bar, Inc., Big Tyme Investments, LLC, Bottoms Up of Houma, Boxer & the Barrel, LLC, CD Enterprises of Houma LLC, CKBCPB5 LLC, Dat Bar, L.L.C., Double Hill Bar & Grill, LLC, JALW, LLC, JOM LLC, Judy's Nitecap, L.L.C., KJ's Place LLC, Longshotz 1, LLC, Marlee Celine, LLC, Outer Limits Bar, PJSanchez LLC, Paradise Sports Bar & Daiquiris, LLC, R Heasley, LLC, R&J Lapeyrouse, LLC, Tap Dat, LLC, Tipsy Cajun, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Order)(Faircloth, Jimmy)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by 4 Aces Enterprises LLC, Big Dan's Bar, Inc., Big Tyme Investments, LLC, Bottoms Up of Houma, Boxer & the Barrel, LLC, CD Enterprises of Houma LLC, CKBCPB5 LLC, Dat Bar, L.L.C., Double Hill Bar & Grill, LLC, JALW, LLC, JOM LLC, Judy's Nitecap, L.L.C., K J's Place LLC, Longshotz 1, LLC, Marlee Celine, LLC, Outer Limits Bar, PJSanchez LLC, Paradise Sports Bar & Daiquiris, LLC, R Heasley, LLC, R&J Lapeyrouse, LLC, Tap Dat, LLC, Tipsy Cajun, LLC (Faircloth, Jimmy)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to H Browning, Jr., John Bel Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(cwa)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Attachments have duplicate descriptions. For attachments, select either a category OR enter a description, selecting both will result in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. (cwa)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (ess)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against John Bel Edwards, H Browning, Jr. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8425633) filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)Attorney Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr added to All Plaintiffs.(Faircloth, Jimmy) Modified text on 7/31/2020 (cwa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 4 Aces Enterprises LLC, et al v. John Bel Edwards, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlee Celine, LLC d/b/a Murphy's
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 4 Aces Enterprises LLC d/b/a 4 Aces Lounge
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dat Bar, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Outer Limits Bar, LLC
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Longshotz 1, LLC d/b/a Longshotz
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jalw, LLC d/b/a The Break Room
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOM LLC d/b/a Just One More
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Tyme Investments, LLC d/b/a Big Daddy's Pub & Grub
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CD Enterprises of Houma LLC d/b/a Larussa's Lounge
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R & J Lapeyrouse, LLC d/b/a Jeaux's New Horizon
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Boxer & The Barrel, LLC
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Dan's Bar, Inc.
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K J's Place LLC
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Double Hill Bar & Grill, LLC
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PJSANCHEZ LLC d/b/a Cobalt Pete's
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy's Nitecap, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tipsy Cajun, LLC
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tap Dat, L.L.C.d/b/a The Brass Monkey
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paradise Sports Bar & Daiquiris, LLC d/b/a Epic Lounge
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bottoms Up of Houma
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Heasley, LLC d/b/a Ram Rod's Saloon
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CKBCPB5 LLC d/b/a The Chatter Box
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boxer & the Barrel, LLC
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paradise Sports Bar & Daiquiris, LLC doing business as Epic Lounge
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tap Dat, LLC doing business as Brass Monkey
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R&J Lapeyrouse, LLC doing business as Jeaux's New Horizon
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Music Cove, LLC
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Longshotz 1, LLC doing business as Longshotz
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JALW, LLC doing business as Break Room
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KJ's Place LLC
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CD Enterprises of Houma LLC doing business as Larussa's Lounge
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PJSanchez LLC doing business as Cobalt Pete's
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R Heasley, LLC doing business as Ram Rod's Saloon
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Outer Limits Bar
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CKBCPB5 LLC doing business as Chatter Box
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Tyme Investments, LLC doing business as Big Daddys Pub & Grub
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOM LLC doing business as Just One More
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlee Celine, LLC doing business as Murphy's
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 4 Aces Enterprises LLC doing business as 4 Aces Lounge
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Jimmy R. Faircloth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bel Edwards
Represented By: Jack M. Weiss
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: Christopher Chocheles
Represented By: Darnell Bludworth
Represented By: Matthew F. Block
Represented By: Joshua Simon Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fire Marshal H Butch Browning, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H Browning, Jr
Represented By: Jack M. Weiss
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: Christopher Chocheles
Represented By: Josie Nicole Serigne
Represented By: Darnell Bludworth
Represented By: Joshua Simon Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butch Browning
Represented By: Jack M. Weiss
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: Christopher Chocheles
Represented By: Josie Nicole Serigne
Represented By: Darnell Bludworth
Represented By: Joshua Simon Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Dodie Horton
Represented By: Glenn Louis Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Phillip Tarver
Represented By: Glenn Louis Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Bob Hensgens
Represented By: Glenn Louis Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ray Garofalo, Jr
Represented By: Glenn Louis Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Richard Nelson
Represented By: Glenn Louis Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michael Echols
Represented By: Glenn Louis Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jonathan Goudeau
Represented By: Glenn Louis Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Danny McCormick
Represented By: Glenn Louis Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Beryl Amadee
Represented By: Glenn Louis Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Larry Frieman
Represented By: Glenn Louis Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rodney Schamerhorn
Represented By: Glenn Louis Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Paul Hollis
Represented By: Glenn Louis Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Raymond Crews
Represented By: Glenn Louis Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ryan Bourriaque
Represented By: Glenn Louis Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Blake Miguez
Represented By: Glenn Louis Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mark Wright
Represented By: Glenn Louis Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Julie Emerson
Represented By: Glenn Louis Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Phillip DeVillier
Represented By: Glenn Louis Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Alan Seabaugh
Represented By: Glenn Louis Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Bob Owen
Represented By: Glenn Louis Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Robert Mills
Represented By: Glenn Louis Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sherman Mack
Represented By: Glenn Louis Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Charles Owen
Represented By: Glenn Louis Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kathy Edmonston
Represented By: Glenn Louis Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Joseph Orgeron
Represented By: Glenn Louis Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?