Brown v. Demolle et al
Plaintiff: Roxann Brown
Defendant: United Financial Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and Nakera Demolle
Case Number: 2:2020cv02216
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2021 10:45 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Jury Trial set for 6/14/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 9/28/20. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(jrc)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 9/28/2020 10:20 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Motion to Seal R. Doc. 1-2. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 8/12/2020. (ajn)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Seal by United Financial Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Musgrave, Richard)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (bm)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (ess)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by United Financial Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent Progressive Corporation, Corporate Parent Progressive Commercial Holdings, Inc. for United Financial Casualty Company (Musgrave, Richard) Modified on 8/11/2020 (bm).
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Compliance by United Financial Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Musgrave, Richard)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from CDC Orleans Parish, case number 2020-03453 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BLAEDC-8440475) filed by United Financial Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)Attorney Richard Todd Musgrave added to party United Financial Casualty Company(pty:dft).(Musgrave, Richard) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/11/2020) (bm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Demolle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Financial Casualty Company
Represented By: Richard Todd Musgrave
Represented By: Amanda Huling Aucoin
Represented By: Magen Whitney Detillieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nakera Demolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxann Brown
Represented By: Arlene Lombard Compass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?