Kinchen et al v. Taylor et al
Plaintiff: Dylan A Kinchen and Dathan C Kinchen
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company, Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc., Earl Hinton, Lynn Taylor, Mercer Transportation Co., Inc., Old Republic Insurance Company and Mercer Transportation Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02217
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the motion #13 is GRANTED. Thomas Joseph Eppling, Corey Patrick Parenton, and Julie Steed Kammer are withdrawn as counsel of record for defendant Earl Hinton in his capacity as a counter-claimant and cross-claimant. However, Thomas Joseph Eppling, Corey Patrick Parenton, and Julie Steed Kammer remain counsel of record for defendant Earl Hinton in his capacity as a defendant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Jeremiah Johns and Nicholas Cenac be substituted as counsel of record for defendant Earl Hinton in his capacity as a counter-claimant and crossclaimant. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 09/25/2020. (am)
September 25, 2020 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Nicholas Cenac to be substituted in place of Corey P. Parenton by Earl Hinton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parenton, Corey)
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM with Jury Demand against Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc., Lynn Taylor, ACE American Insurance Company, COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against Dylan A Kinchen by Earl Hinton, Old Republic Insurance Company.(Parenton, Corey)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by Dathan C Kinchen. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Notice of Submission)(Beall, Russell)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by ACE American Insurance Company, Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc., Lynn Taylor.Attorney Peter Joseph Wanek added to party ACE American Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Joseph Wanek added to party Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Joseph Wanek added to party Lynn Taylor(pty:dft).(Wanek, Peter)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: GRANTING #7 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Russell W Beall for Dathan C Kinchen,Russell W Beall for Dylan A Kinchen. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 09/01/2020. (am)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Russell W Beal1 by Dathan C Kinchen, Dylan A Kinchen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mack, Sherman) Modified text on 9/1/2020 (am).
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Compliance by Mercer Transportation Company, Inc. re #4 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Parenton, Corey)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal, Document State Court Pleadings lists counsel of record M.Todd for a party in this action who have not been admitted to practice in this court. Any party not appearing in proper person must be represented by a member of the bar of this court (L.R. 83.2.4). Please see Local Rule 83.2.2 for this courts Procedures for Admission and Local Rule 83.2.5 for Visiting Attorneys to appear and participate Pro Hac Vice.
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b)re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Mercer Transportation Co., Inc. (bm)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand - Petition for Damages by Mercer Transportation Co., Inc..(Parenton, Corey)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (aj)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 21st Judicial District Court, Parish of Tangipahoa, case number 2020-0001761 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8440759) filed by Mercer Transportation Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Corey Patrick Parenton added to party Mercer Transportation Co., Inc.(pty:dft).(Parenton, Corey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinchen et al v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: Lindsay G. Faulkner
Represented By: Kyle P. Kirsch
Represented By: Peter Joseph Wanek
Represented By: Kathryn T. Trew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Lindsay G. Faulkner
Represented By: Kyle P. Kirsch
Represented By: Peter Joseph Wanek
Represented By: Kathryn T. Trew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Hinton
Represented By: Corey Patrick Parenton
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Eppling
Represented By: Julie Steed Kammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Taylor
Represented By: Lindsay G. Faulkner
Represented By: Kyle P. Kirsch
Represented By: Peter Joseph Wanek
Represented By: Kathryn T. Trew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercer Transportation Co., Inc.
Represented By: Corey Patrick Parenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Company
Represented By: Corey Patrick Parenton
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Eppling
Represented By: Julie Steed Kammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercer Transportation Company, Inc.
Represented By: Corey Patrick Parenton
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Eppling
Represented By: Julie Steed Kammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan A Kinchen
Represented By: Russell W Beall
Represented By: Sherman Q. Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dathan C Kinchen
Represented By: Russell W Beall
Represented By: Sherman Q. Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?