O'Keefe v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Brian OKeefe and Brian O'Keefe
Defendant: Randolph Simmons, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company and USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv02251
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #4 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter) (ajn)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 MOTION to Withdraw Document. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is MOTION to Remand to State Court. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 EX PARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Notice of Removal and Remand to State Court by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-Ntc of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B-Petition)(Barnett, Thomas) Modified text/event on 9/8/2020 (jeg)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 **DEFICIENT** MOTION to Withdraw Document re #1 Notice of Removal, by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal Notice of Removal, #2 State Court Pleadings Petition)(Barnett, Thomas) Modified on 9/4/2020 (jeg).
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (ess)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, case number 2020-05483 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8447106) filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit) Attorney Thomas H. Barnett added to party Hartford Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Barnett, Thomas) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/14/2020) (bm). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/14/2020) (bm). Modified on 8/14/2020 (bm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Keefe v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randolph Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas H. Barnett
Represented By: Julie Eustis Vaicius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian OKeefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian O'Keefe
Represented By: Justin McCarthy Chopin
Represented By: Philip Donatien Lorio, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?