Roby v. Britton et al
Plaintiff: Louis Roby, Sr.
Defendant: RPM Pizza, LLC, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Annie Britton, RPM Pizza LLC doing business as Domino's Pizza Inc and GEICO Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv02257
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Louis Roby, Sr re #8 MOTION to Remand. (mm)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/1/2020. (mm)
October 1, 2020 Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 REPLY to Response to Motion. **1. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Motion for Leave for File Document. Clerk took corrective action. 2. Filing attorney did not select category 'Proposed Pleading' when attaching document for which leave to file is being requested. Clerk took corrective action. ** (mm)
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum filed by Louis Roby, Sr re #8 MOTION to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Shearman, Brian) Modified event/text on 10/1/2020 (mm).
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by RPM Pizza LLC re #8 MOTION to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Chancellor, Sarah) Modified on 9/29/2020 (mm).
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Sarah S. Vance. Jury Trial (3 days) set for 6/28/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Sarah S. Vance. All discovery must be completed by 5/18/2021.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 9/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(jjs)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by Louis Roby, Sr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit-Release, #4 Exhibit-Discovery Requests, #5 Exhibit-Discovery Responses)(Shearman, Brian)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/2020 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 9/3/2020.(jjs)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Response/Reply. **1. Document lists counsel of record, Sarah L. Chancellor, for a party in this action who has not been admitted to practice in this court. Any party not appearing in proper person must be represented by a member of the bar of this court (L.R. 83.2.4). Please see Local Rule 83.2.2 for this court's Procedures for Admission and Local Rule 83.2.5 for Visiting Attorneys to appear and participate Pro Hac Vice. Future filings which list attorneys not admitted will not be accepted. 2. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Notice of Compliance. Clerk took corrective action. 3. Filing attorney should have linked filing to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance by RPM Pizza LLC as to #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2(a), #2 Exhibit 3(a)-(g))(Nalley, George) Modified text/linkage/event on 8/17/2020 (mm).
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by RPM Pizza, LLC. (lt)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by RPM Pizza, LLC (Nalley, George)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court - Orleans Parish, case number 2020-1194 "F" (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8447680) filed by RPM Pizza, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E State Court Pleadings, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney George John Nalley, Jr added to party RPM Pizza, LLC(pty:dft).(Nalley, George) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/14/2020) (lt). (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/14/2020) (lt). Modified on 8/14/2020 (lt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roby v. Britton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RPM Pizza, LLC
Represented By: George John Nalley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annie Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RPM Pizza LLC doing business as Domino's Pizza Inc
Represented By: George John Nalley, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah Chancellor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Amber E. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Roby, Sr.
Represented By: Brian G. Shearman
Represented By: John H Denenea, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?