Dotson v. Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: David Dotson
Defendant: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv02274
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Susie Morgan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/28/2021 at 1:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/8/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. 5 day Jury Trial set for 8/2/2021 at 9:00 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. All discovery must be completed by 5/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(bwn)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company.(Durbin, Tabitha)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Intact Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Intact Insurance Group USA Holdings, Inc. for Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company (Durbin, Tabitha) Modified text on 8/24/2020 (sbs).
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE - Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/2020 at 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Clerk.(bwn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Compliance by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Durbin, Tabitha) Modified text, added link on 8/20/2020 (sbs).
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 DIRECTIVE OF THE CLERK regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company.(sbs)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2020-02882 F (7) (Filing fee $400 receipt number ALAEDC-8450813) filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)Attorney Tabitha Robertson Durbin added to party Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Durbin, Tabitha) Modified text on 8/18/2020 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dotson v. Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Tabitha Robertson Durbin
Represented By: Dakota Kyle Chenevert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Dotson
Represented By: Caleb Didriksen
Represented By: Carl Allen Woods, III
Represented By: Alexander Arthur Lauricella
Represented By: Erin B. Saucier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?