Morse v. Wiser et al
Plaintiff: Richard H. Morse
Defendant: Phoenix Insurance Company, Hudson Insurance Company, Hudson Specialty Insurance Company, Hudson Insurance Group, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and Anthony Wiser
Case Number: 2:2020cv02287
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2021 11:00 AM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Jury Trial set for 5/17/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. All discovery must be completed by 3/8/2021. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Issued for the Court by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF: Magistrate Judge)(ko)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/8/2020 11:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(ko)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Compliance by Hudson Specialty Insurance Company re #3 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Alario, Annissa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Hudson Specialty Insurance Company.(lt)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (cc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court Parish of Orleans, case number 2020-04194 C-10 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8454519) filed by Hudson Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit B Restricted Motion and Order to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit C State Court Records, #4 Exhibit D Consent to Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Certificate of Service)Attorney Annissa M. Alario added to party Hudson Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Alario, Annissa) Modified on 8/19/2020 (lt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morse v. Wiser et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy Michael Waller, Sr.
Represented By: Stephen Michael DuValle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Insurance Company
Represented By: Annissa M. Alario
Represented By: Lyon H. Garrison
Represented By: Kevin Truxillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Annissa M. Alario
Represented By: Lyon H. Garrison
Represented By: Kevin Truxillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Wiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard H. Morse
Represented By: Michael Richard Allweiss
Represented By: Abigail Frank Gerrity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?