Muriel's New Orleans, LLC v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Muriel's New Orleans, LLC and Muriel's New Orleans, LLC doing business as Muriel's Jackson Square
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv02295
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 21 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #20 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion for Remand. **Images filed sideways. Clerk has corrected images. No further action necessary.** (jls)
October 16, 2020 Filing 20 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion for Remand by Muriel's New Orleans, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading Reply)(Zimmer, Charles) (Main Document 20 and Attachment 2 replaced to correct orientation on 10/16/2020) (jls). Modified text on 10/16/2020 (jls).
October 13, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Strauss, David)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #13 MOTION to Continue Submission Date of State Farm's #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The submission date is continued from 10/21/2020 to 11/18/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/1/2020.(jls)
September 28, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re #13 MOTION to Continue Submission Date of State Farm's Motion to Dismiss . (Crews, Chelsea)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #14 MOTION to Expedite. Muriel's New Orleans, LLC's #13 motion to continue is set for submission, without oral argument, on 9/30/2020, at 9:00 AM, with any opposition due by 9/28/2020, at 5:00 PM. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/24/2020.(jls)
September 24, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re #14 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Continue (Doc. 13) . (Crews, Chelsea)
September 23, 2020 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Continue (Doc. 13) by Muriel's New Orleans, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lewis, Jonathan)
September 23, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Continue Submission Date of State Farm's Motion to Dismiss by Muriel's New Orleans, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Lewis, Jonathan) Modified text on 9/23/2020 (jls).
September 16, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L)(Crews, Chelsea)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record. Attorneys Roderick Alvendia and James McClendon Williams are hereby added as counsel of record for Plaintiff, Muriel's New Orleans, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/14/2020. (jls)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Roderick Alvendia and James M. Williams by Muriel's New Orleans, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lewis, Jonathan) Modified text on 9/14/2020 (jls).
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Muriel's New Orleans, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Lewis, Jonathan)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Defendant is granted an additional twenty-one days to file responsive pleadings to the petition filed by Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/25/2020. (jls)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer . **Document has been marked as being filed in error. See rec. doc. 6 for the corrected filing.** (jls)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crews, Chelsea) Modified text/linkage on 8/24/2020 (jls).
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 **FILED IN ERROR - See doc. 6 for corrected filing** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crews, Chelsea) Modified text/linkage on 8/24/2020 (jls).
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (sek)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re #2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure, #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of All Parties Remaining in this Action. (Crews, Chelsea)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Crews, Chelsea)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2020-5043 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8455748) filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C", #4 Exhibit "D", #5 Exhibit "E", #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Chelsea Coleman Crews added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft).(Crews, Chelsea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muriel's New Orleans, LLC v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muriel's New Orleans, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muriel's New Orleans, LLC doing business as Muriel's Jackson Square
Represented By: Daniel Ernest Davillier
Represented By: Charles F. Zimmer, II
Represented By: Jonathan David Lewis
Represented By: James McClendon Williams
Represented By: Roderick Alvendia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Chelsea Coleman Crews
Represented By: David A. Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?