Obike v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Obike
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Greg Julian Morris, 365 Enterprises, LLC, GEICO Casualty Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company and Greg Morris
Case Number: 2:2020cv02297
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Notice of Compliance. **Filing attorney should have linked filing to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Compliance re #1 Notice of Removal by 365 Enterprises, LLC, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Additional State Court Sheriff's Returns)(Cosby, Sandra) Modified linkage on 9/1/2020 (mm).
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by 365 Enterprises, LLC, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. By the Clerk. (mm)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Notice of Compliance. **The State Court Pleadings should have been attached to the Notice of Removal when it was filed. Clerk took corrective action and attached the State Court Pleadings to record document 1. No further action is needed.** (mm)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Compliance with 28 USC 1447(b) by 365 Enterprises, LLC, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Trial Pleadings)(Cosby, Sandra)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by 365 Enterprises, LLC, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Cosby, Sandra)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 20-04273 G-11 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8456214) filed by 365 Enterprises, LLC, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice to All Adverse Parties and State Court) Attorney Sandra Kaye Cosby added to party 365 Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Kaye Cosby added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Cosby, Sandra) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2020: #3 State Court Pleadings) (mm). Modified text on 8/21/2020 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Obike v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Sandra Kaye Cosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Julian Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 365 Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Sandra Kaye Cosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Kaitlin Mary Pastorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Obike
Represented By: Edward J. Womac, Jr.
Represented By: Jacob George Powell, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?