Celino et al v. Biotronik Inc et al
Plaintiff: Sam Celino, Sr, Sam Celino, Jr., Christian Celino and Colin Celino
Defendant: Biotronik Inc and Biotronik Sales, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02298
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 Filing 12 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Biotronik Inc identifying Corporate Parent MS Holding II SE for Biotronik Inc (Jaeckel, Shannon)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #10 Motion to Continue Submission Date is GRANTED. Defendant's #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim shall be submitted on OCTOBER 28, 2020. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on October 7, 2020.(mp)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date by Christian Celino, Colin Celino, Sam Celino, Sr, Sam Celino, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller-Radovic, Lizette) Modified text on 10/6/2020 (mp).
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court has received a request for oral argument. The Court declines to schedule oral argument at this time. If, at a later date, the Court finds that oral argument would be helpful, counsel will be notified. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on September 17, 2020.(mp)
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Biotronik Inc regarding #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Jaeckel, Shannon)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Biotronik Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Jaeckel, Shannon)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Compliance by Biotronik Inc re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(Jaeckel, Shannon) Modified text/link on 9/5/2020 (mp).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Biotronik Inc answer due 9/16/2020. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 8/21/2020. (blg)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Biotronik Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jaeckel, Shannon)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Biotronik Sales, Inc., Biotronik Inc. (lt)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (sek)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd Judicial District Court, Parish of St Tammany, case number 202011403 Div. B (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8456242) filed by Biotronik Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Records, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Shannon Marie Jaeckel added to party Biotronik Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon Marie Jaeckel added to party Biotronik Sales, Inc.(pty:dft).(Jaeckel, Shannon) Modified on 8/20/2020 (lt). Modified on 8/21/2020 (blg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Celino et al v. Biotronik Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biotronik Inc
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biotronik Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Celino, Sr
Represented By: Tammie E Holley
Represented By: Lizette Miller-Radovic
Represented By: Karla Marie Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Celino, Jr.
Represented By: Tammie E Holley
Represented By: Lizette Miller-Radovic
Represented By: Karla Marie Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Celino
Represented By: Tammie E Holley
Represented By: Lizette Miller-Radovic
Represented By: Karla Marie Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colin Celino
Represented By: Tammie E Holley
Represented By: Lizette Miller-Radovic
Represented By: Karla Marie Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?