Newby v. Krider et al
Plaintiff: Larry Newby, Jr.
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lyft, Inc., GEICO Casualty Company, Joseph Krider and Steadfast Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv02364
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Joseph Krider. (sbs)
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 Request of Summons Issued as to Joseph Krider filed by Larry Newby, Jr re #1 Notice of Removal. (Hesse, Paul) (Main Document 12 replaced on 10/4/2020) (sbs). Modified text on 10/5/2020 (sbs).
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by USAA General Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent United Services Automobile Association for USAA General Indemnity Company. (Booth, Emily) Modified text on 9/28/2020 (sbs).
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Indian Harbor Insurance Company.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Albert, Andrea) Modified text, removed link on 9/11/2020 (sbs).
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Lyft, Inc. Attorney Andrea Leigh Albert added to party Lyft, Inc. (pty:dft).(Albert, Andrea) Modified text on 9/3/2020 (sbs).
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Lyft, Inc. (Albert, Andrea)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Indian Harbor Insurance Company.(Albert, Andrea) Modified text on 9/3/2020 (sbs).
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Indian Harbor Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent XL Bermuda Ltd., Corporate Parent AXA Assurance Vie Mutuelle, Corporate Parent AXA SA, Corporate Parent XL Reinsurance America Inc., Corporate Parent XL Group Ltd., Corporate Parent XL Specialty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent X.L. America, Inc. for Indian Harbor Insurance Company (Albert, Andrea)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance by Indian Harbor Insurance Company to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record)(Albert, Andrea) Modified text and link on 9/3/2020 (sbs).
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Indian Harbor amend its Notice of Removal to include "summary-judgment type evidence" demonstrating the amount in controversy in this case exceeds $75,000 by no later than Monday, September 14, 2020, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/31/2020.(sbs)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. By the Clerk. (bm)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2020-03006 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8468178) filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment, #5 Exhibit GEICO Consent to Removal, #6 Exhibit USAA Consent to Removal)Attorney Andrea Leigh Albert added to party Indian Harbor Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Albert, Andrea) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/27/2020) (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newby v. Krider et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Represented By: Emily E Booth
Represented By: Peter Joseph Wanek
Represented By: Colin L. Casciato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Albert
Represented By: David M. Moragas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyft, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Moragas
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Trevor Fulton Gee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Krider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Newby, Jr.
Represented By: Lucas Jason Cuccia
Represented By: Paul Hesse
Represented By: Gregory Brice Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?