Doe v. Tonti Management Co, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Sally Boyer, Lynn Montz, Tonti Management Co., Inc., Sherri Roane, Tonti Management Co, L.L.C. and APMT Management Services, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02466
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #48 Motion for Extension Time to File Opposition is GRANTED. The #30 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay and the #34 Motion to Defer Consideration of Motion to Compel Arbitration will be submitted DECEMBER 2, 2020. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on November 5, 2020.(mp)
November 4, 2020 Filing 49 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #48 MOTION for Extension of Deadlines for Response Briefs. 1.) Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'.Exparte/Consent motions are not set for hearing. Clerk has removed hearing date. 2.) The title of the attached proposed order should not include the word 'Proposed' but only reflect 'Order' on the actual document. No further action is necessary. (mp)
November 4, 2020 Filing 48 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Deadlines for Response Briefs by Jane Doe. M (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Edmunds, Christopher) Modified text on 11/4/2020 (mp).
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DENYING #40 Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 11/2/2020. (dw)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING #43 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibit Supporting Motion for Discovery. Clerk shall file the exhibit into the record under SEAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 11/2/2020. (dw)
October 30, 2020 Filing 45 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #40 MOTION for Discovery related to preliminary injunction motion. Filing attorney should have selected 'No' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'.Clerk took corrective action to set motion for submission on 11/18/2020 before Magistrate Judge North. No further action is necessary. (mp)
October 28, 2020 Filing 44 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #43 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibit Supporting Motion for Discovery. 1.) Filing attorney did not include a proposed order. Proposed Order subsequently provided to Clerk and has now been attached to the motion. 2.) The title of the attached proposed order should not include the word 'Proposed' but only reflect Order on the actual document. (mp)
October 28, 2020 Filing 43 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibit Supporting Motion for Discovery by Jane Doe. Motion(s) referred to Michael North (Edmunds, Christopher) Modified referral on 10/28/2020 (mp). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2020: #1 Proposed Order) (mp).
October 28, 2020 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Jane Doe re #20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (mp)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #36 Motion for Leave to File Reply is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on October 28, 2020. (mp)
October 28, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Discovery related to preliminary injunction motion by Jane Doe. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibits, #3 Notice of Submission)(Edmunds, Christopher) Modified submission on 10/30/2020 (mp). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2020 per #46 Order: #4 Sealed Declaration) (dw).
October 27, 2020 Filing 39 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Discovery by Jane Doe. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibits)(Edmunds, Christopher) Modified on 10/28/2020 (mp).
October 27, 2020 Filing 38 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #37 Reply to Response to Motion. Reply was incorrectly filed as a separate document instead of as an attachment to the Motion for Leave to File. Clerk took corrective action. No further action is needed. (mp)
October 27, 2020 Filing 37 ***FILED IN ERROR, See R. Doc. 36: REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Jane Doe re #20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Edmunds, Christopher) Modified on 10/27/2020 (mp).
October 27, 2020 Filing 36 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 proposed order)(Edmunds, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/27/2020: #2 Proposed Pleading) (mp).
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #33 Motion for Leave to File Certain Unredacted Exhibits Under Seal is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on October 26, 2020. (mp)
October 23, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION to Defer Consideration of #30 Motion to Compel Arbitration by Jane Doe. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Defer Consideration of Motion to Compel Arbitration, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit A)(Edmunds, Christopher) Modified link on 10/26/2020 (mp).
October 22, 2020 Filing 33 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Under Seal by APMT Management Services, L.L.C., Sally Boyer, Lynn Montz, Sherri Roane, Tonti Management Co, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rather, James)
October 22, 2020 Filing 32 DEFICIENT: MOTION Motion to Defer Consideration of the Motion to Compel Arbitration by Jane Doe. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Defer Consideration, #2 Exhibit A)(Edmunds, Christopher) Modified on 10/22/2020 (mp).
October 20, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rather, James)
October 20, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay by APMT Management Services, L.L.C., Sally Boyer, Lynn Montz, Sherri Roane, Tonti Management Co, L.L.C.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(Rather, James) Modified filers on 10/21/2020 (mp). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/26/2020: #7 Sealed Exhibit) (mp).
October 20, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by APMT Management Services, L.L.C., Sally Boyer, Lynn Montz, Sherri Roane, Tonti Management Co, L.L.C..(Rather, James) Modified text/filers on 10/21/2020 (mp).
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants shall file any response to plaintiff's complaint by OCTOBER 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on October 6, 2020. (mp)
October 6, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Jane Doe re #26 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, . (Edmunds, Christopher)
October 5, 2020 Filing 26 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Sally Boyer, Lynn Montz, Sherri Roane, Tonti Management Co, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney James C. Rather, Jr added to party Sally Boyer(pty:dft), Attorney James C. Rather, Jr added to party Lynn Montz(pty:dft), Attorney James C. Rather, Jr added to party Sherri Roane(pty:dft), Attorney James C. Rather, Jr added to party Tonti Management Co, L.L.C.(pty:dft).(Rather, James)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #21 Motion for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in referencing the sealed exhibits supporting the motion, the defendants must refrain from using Doe's name or other identifying information. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Does counsel shall provide defendants with a copy of this order no later than OCTOBER 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on October 5, 2020. (mp)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is set for submission on OCTOBER 28, 2020. Defendants shall file any opposition to the motion by OCTOBER 20, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Doe's counsel shall cause a copy of this order to be served on defendants no later than OCTOBER 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on October 5, 2020.(mp)
October 5, 2020 Filing 23 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #21 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal. 1.) Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent motions are not set for hearing. Clerk has removed hearing date. 2.) Filing attorney did not include a proposed order. Proposed Order subsequently provided to Clerk and has now been attached to the motion. (mp)
October 5, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Christopher F Edmunds re #20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #21 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Edmunds, Christopher)
October 3, 2020 Filing 21 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal by Jane Doe. (Edmunds, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2020: #1 Proposed Order) (mp). Modified text/submission on 10/5/2020 (mp).
October 3, 2020 Filing 20 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Edmunds, Christopher) Modified text on 10/5/2020 (mp). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2020: #3 Sealed Exhibits) (mp).
September 22, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Lynn Montz served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Edmunds, Christopher)
September 22, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Sally Boyer served on 9/14/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Edmunds, Christopher)
September 17, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Sherri Roane served on 9/13/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Edmunds, Christopher) Modified text on 9/17/2020 (mp).
September 17, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Tonti Management Co, L.L.C. served on 9/13/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Edmunds, Christopher) Modified text on 9/17/2020 (mp).
September 16, 2020 Filing 15 DEFICIENT: SUMMONS Returned Executed; Sherri Roane served on 9/13/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Edmunds, Christopher) Modified on 9/17/2020 (mp).
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 DEFICIENT: SUMMONS Returned Executed; Tonti Management Co, L.L.C. served on 9/13/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Edmunds, Christopher) Modified on 9/17/2020 (mp).
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 Unredacted Complaint. (mp)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order re Motion for Leave to File Unredacted Complaint. (mp)
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT Motion for Leave to File Unredacted Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (mp)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #3 Motion to Proceed Anonymously is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Doe's counsel shall file a motion under seal seeking to file a sealed copy of the complaint containing Doe's name by MONDAY, SEPTEMBER 14, 2020 at 5:00 PM. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on September 11, 2020. (mp)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 , #5 , #6 , and #7 Requests for Summons Issued. For future filings, page 2 should be attached to page 1 of summons. Clerk has attached 2nd page of summons. Please use both pages when filing of return of service of summons. (mp)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Sally Boyer, Lynn Montz, Sherri Roane, Tonti Management Co, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(mp)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 Request of Summons Issued as to Sally Boyer filed by Jane Doe re #1 Complaint,. (Edmunds, Christopher)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 Request of Summons Issued as to Sherri Roane filed by Jane Doe re #1 Complaint,. (Edmunds, Christopher)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 Request of Summons Issued as to Lynn Montz filed by Jane Doe re #1 Complaint,. (Edmunds, Christopher)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to Tonti Management Co, L.L.C. filed by Jane Doe re #1 Complaint,. (Edmunds, Christopher)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Leave of Court to Proceed Under a Pseudonym by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Edmunds, Christopher)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8489806) filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Christopher F Edmunds added to party Jane Doe(pty:selreq).(Edmunds, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Tonti Management Co, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Boyer
Represented By: James C. Rather, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Montz
Represented By: James C. Rather, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonti Management Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri Roane
Represented By: James C. Rather, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonti Management Co, L.L.C.
Represented By: James C. Rather, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APMT Management Services, L.L.C.
Represented By: James C. Rather, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Christopher F Edmunds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?