Manson Construction Co. v. Teche Towing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Manson Construction Co.
Defendant: Teche Towing, Inc. and Stonington Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv02538
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lance M Africk: Status Conference held on 12/15/2020. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall provide each other with the relevant policies no later than MONDAY, DECEMBER 28, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the above captioned case is hereby ADMINISTRATIVELY STAYED AND CLOSED. The case will be re-opened upon either partys motion within thirty days of a judgment in the underlying dispute or for good cause. (cwa)
December 8, 2020 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT by Manson Construction Co. (McLeod, Evans)
December 8, 2020 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT by Teche Towing, Inc. (Johnson, Edward)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: A STATUS CONFERENCE will be held BY TELEPHONE on TUESDAY, DECEMBER 15, 2020 at 9:00 A.M. Counsel shall comply as instructed herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on November 18, 2020.(mp)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: All discovery must be completed by 2/22/2021. Telephone Status Conference set for 12/15/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Jury Trial set for 5/10/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF: Magistrate Judge)(blg)
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER: A Preliminary Conference BY TELEPHONE is set for 11/17/2020 09:00 AM before the Case Manager. Call-in instructions provided herein. Signed by Case Manager. (mp)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Teche Towing, Inc..Attorney Edward Settoon Johnson added to party Teche Towing, Inc.(pty:dft).(Johnson, Edward)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Stonington Insurance Company by Manson Construction Co.. (McLeod, Evans)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Stonington Insurance Company served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (McLeod, Evans)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Teche Towing, Inc. served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (McLeod, Evans)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Stonington Insurance Company, Teche Towing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(bm)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (ess)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8503176) filed by Manson Construction Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Teche Towing, Inc., #3 Summons Stonington Insurance Company)Attorney Evans Martin McLeod added to party Manson Construction Co.(pty:pla).(McLeod, Evans)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manson Construction Co. v. Teche Towing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teche Towing, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Settoon Johnson
Represented By: Christopher Lawrence Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stonington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manson Construction Co.
Represented By: Evans Martin McLeod
Represented By: Justin Cole Warner
Represented By: Magdalini Galitou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?