Rooney v. Hospira, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Donna Rooney
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Actavis LLC, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Actavis Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc., Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Pfizer Inc, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC SEPARATELY doing business as Winthrop U.S., Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd., McKesson Corporation doing business as McKesson Packaging, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, Inc., Sanofi S.A., Unidentified Parties, Hospira, Inc., Accord Healthcare, Inc., Aventis Pharma S.A., Winthrop U.S. and Sun Pharma Global FZE
Case Number: 2:2020cv02664
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:20-cv-06478. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (ecm)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the USDC for the LAED. (dm ) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by DONNA ROONEY re #14 Cross MOTION to Stay re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Orders, #2 Exhibit Orders)(BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by HOSPIRA INC., HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(MANNING, FRANCIS) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Set Deadlines as to the #14 Cross MOTION to Stay re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Motion set for 8/17/2020 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 14 Cross MOTION to Stay re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by HOSPIRA INC., HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Certification, #5 Exhibit 1 to Certification, #6 Exhibit 2 to Certification, #7 Exhibit 3 to Certification, #8 Exhibit 4 to Certification)(MANNING, FRANCIS) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #13 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC, HOSPIRA INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/03/2020. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 13 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Third Amended Complaint.. (MANNING, FRANCIS) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 Summons Issued, by HOSPIRA INC., HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC. (MANNING, FRANCIS) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 11 Letter from Sandoz, Inc. withdraws its request for a consent order to extend the time for Sandoz to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (Docket # 10) re #10 Letter. (VAN NOSTRAND, AARON) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 10 Letter from Sandoz requesting Consent Order that extends the time for Sandoz to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(VAN NOSTRAND, AARON) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC., ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., HOSPIRA INC., HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, SAGENT PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ, INC., SANOFI U.S. SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., Winthrop U.S.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Summons to be Issued by DONNA ROONEY, Winthrop U.S. as to ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC., ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., HOSPIRA INC., HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, SAGENT PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ, INC., SANOFI U.S. SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., Winthrop U.S.. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Set Deadlines as to the #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion set for 8/3/2020 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (MANNING, FRANCIS) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Set Deadlines as to the #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion set for 7/20/2020 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOSPIRA INC., HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC identifying Pfizer Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (NORCIA, ROBERT) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set via telephone for 7/30/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling Conference DEA) (ce3) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCIS X. MANNING on behalf of HOSPIRA INC., HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC (MANNING, FRANCIS) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
May 28, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - KAREN HOPE BEYEA-SCHROEDER appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (mg) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Judge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
May 28, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: This Notice of Removal has previously been opened as 3:20-cv-6476 AND 3:20-cv-6477. In the event an error is made during the case opening process please call (609)989-2065 for assistance. DO NOT create a new case. ALL plaintiffs and defendants listed in the caption of the original state court complaint should have been added to the docket . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HOSPIRA INC., HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, INC. from Superior Court of Middlesex County, NJ, case number MID-L-003052-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10868551), filed by HOSPIRA INC., HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Certification, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(NORCIA, ROBERT) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rooney v. Hospira, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide, LLC
Represented By: Francis X. Manning
Represented By: ROBERT J. NORCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC SEPARATELY doing business as Winthrop U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation doing business as McKesson Packaging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Francis X. Manning
Represented By: ROBERT J. NORCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira, Inc.
Represented By: Francis X. Manning
Represented By: ROBERT J. NORCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accord Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aventis Pharma S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winthrop U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharma Global FZE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Rooney
Represented By: Karen Beyea-Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?