Maze v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: James Eugene Maze
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv02757
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jordan S. Harcleroad of Summons and Complaint served on U.S. Attorney's Office on 10/24/2020; answer due 12/23/2020, Social Security Administration-Office of the Regional Chief Counsel on 10/26/2020; answer due 12/28/2020, and United States Attorney General on 10/30/2020; answer due 12/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Executed Affidavits of Mailing)(Wicklund, Edward) Modified text/updated answer due date on 11/2/2020 (mm).
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (sa)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 10/13/2020. (sa)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Edward A Wicklund, as counsel for plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 10/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (sa)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Eugene Maze. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 In Forma Pauperis, #2 Proposed Order)(Misko, Benjamin)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the civil cover sheet and summons. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (mm)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go)
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Edward A. Wicklund Motion referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8537468) by James Eugene Maze. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Misko, Benjamin) Modified text/added referral on 10/9/2020 (mm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2020: #4 ECF Privilege Form) (sa).
October 8, 2020 Filing 2 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Eugene Maze. (Attachments: #1 In Forma Pauperis, #2 Proposed Order)(Misko, Benjamin) Modified text on 10/9/2020 (mm).
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (In Forma Pauperis status requested) filed by James Eugene Maze. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) Attorney Benjamin M. Misko added to party James Eugene Maze(pty:pla).(Misko, Benjamin) Modified text on 10/8/2020 (mm). (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/8/2020) (mm). (Attachment 3 replaced on 10/8/2020) (mm). (Attachment 4 replaced on 10/8/2020) (mm). (Attachment 5 replaced on 10/8/2020) (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maze v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Eugene Maze
Represented By: Benjamin M. Misko
Represented By: Edward A Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?