Peninsula Petroleum, Ltd. v. Oratorio M/V et al
Plaintiff: Peninsula Petroleum, Ltd.
Defendant: Oratorio M/V and Cygnus Line Shipping, SA
Case Number: 2:2020cv02987
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 31341
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to All Defendants by Peninsula Petroleum, Ltd. (Carrigee, David) Modified text on 11/30/2020 (sbs).
November 9, 2020 Filing 10 Seizure Warrant Returned Executed. Served on Cpt. Altemio Arongat, Oratorio M/V on 11/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Return)(sbs)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appoint/Substitute Custodian. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 11/4/2020. (sbs) (3CC: USM)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 11/4/2020. (sbs) (3CC: USM)
November 4, 2020 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION and Order for Appointment of Substitute Custodian by Peninsula Petroleum, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation of Staltzman, #2 Certificate of Insurance)(Carrigee, David) Modified text on 11/4/2020 (sbs). (3CC: USM)
November 4, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION for Costs by Peninsula Petroleum, Ltd. (Carrigee, David) Modified text on 11/4/2020 (sbs).
November 4, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION Regarding Movement of Vessel and Indemnity to the United States and Marshal by Peninsula Petroleum, Ltd. (Carrigee, David) Modified text on 11/4/2020 (sbs).
November 4, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest and Writ of Attachment of Vessel by Peninsula Petroleum, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carrigee, David) Modified text on 11/4/2020 (sbs). (3CC: USM)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number ALAEDC-8580421) filed by Peninsula Petroleum, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)Attorney David Louis Carrigee added to party Peninsula Petroleum, Ltd.(pty:pla).(Carrigee, David) (3CC: USM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peninsula Petroleum, Ltd. v. Oratorio M/V et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oratorio M/V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cygnus Line Shipping, SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peninsula Petroleum, Ltd.
Represented By: David Louis Carrigee
Represented By: William Bryon Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?