Clifton v. Famous Bourbon Management Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Clifton, Allyssa Pate, Kuria Richard, Najah Julian, Valerie Tavares, Melanie Young, Margaret Watson and Roxane Parra
Defendant: Manhattan Fashion, LLC, Joseph Ascani, Temptations, Inc., Guy Olano, Jr., Silver Bourbon, Inc., Guy Olano, III, Famous Bourbon Management Group, Inc., Raymond Palazzolo, N'awlins Entertainment Group, Inc., Temptations Inc doing business as Stiletto's Cabaret, Silver Bourbon, Inc. doing business as Scores French Quarter, Manhattan Fashion, LLC doing business as Scores West and Scott Yaffee
Case Number: 2:2020cv02991
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Susie Morgan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0207
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join Wage Claim Roxane Parra by Kelly Clifton. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Gutierrez, Tina) Modified text on 12/16/2020 (sbs).
November 30, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Filed Consent Form by Valerie Tavares re #2 Notice. (Gutierrez, Tina) Modified text and filer on 11/30/2020 (sbs).
November 19, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Consents to Wage Claim Melanie Young by Kelly Clifton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gutierrez, Tina) Modified text added party on 11/20/2020 (sbs).
November 16, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Scott Yaffee. (sbs)
November 13, 2020 Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Kelly Clifton. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Gutierrez, Tina)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Tina Gutierrez. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 11/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (sbs)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David Wayne Hodges. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 11/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (sbs)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tina E. Gutierrez (Filing fee $100 receipt number ALAEDC-8589227) by Kelly Clifton. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Consent to Electronic Filing)(Meyaski, Stacey) Modified text on 11/10/2020 (sbs).
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice David W. Hodges (Filing fee $100 receipt number ALAEDC-8589192) by Kelly Clifton. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Consent to Electronic Filing)(Meyaski, Stacey) Modified text on 11/10/2020 (sbs). (Attachment 4 replaced on 11/10/2020) (sbs).
November 5, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Joseph Ascani, Famous Bourbon Management Group, Inc., Manhattan Fashion, LLC, N'awlins Entertainment Group, Inc., Guy Olano, III, Guy Olano, Jr, Raymond Palazzolo, Silver Bourbon, Inc., Temptations, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(lt)
November 4, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (aj)
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Consents to Join Wage Claim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -Consent to Pursue Wage Claim, #2 Exhibit 2 - Consent to Pursue Wage Claim, #3 Exhibit 3 - Consent to Pursue Wage Claim, #4 Exhibit 4 - Consent to Pursue Wage Claim, #5 Exhibit 5 - Consent to Pursue Wage Claim)(Meyaski, Stacey)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Famous Bourbon Management Group, Inc., Manhattan Fashion, LLC, Silver Bourbon, Inc., Temptations, Inc., N'awlins Entertainment Group, Inc., Guy Olano III, Guy Olano, Jr., Joseph Ascani, and Raymond Palazzolo (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8580661) filed by Kelly Clifton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons) Attorney Stacey LaGraize Meyaski added to party Kelly Clifton(pty:pla).(Meyaski, Stacey) Modified text on 11/5/2020 (lt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clifton v. Famous Bourbon Management Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Clifton
Represented By: Stacey LaGraize Meyaski
Represented By: Kenneth Todd Wallace
Represented By: Tina Gutierrez
Represented By: David Wayne Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allyssa Pate
Represented By: Stacey LaGraize Meyaski
Represented By: Kenneth Todd Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kuria Richard
Represented By: Stacey LaGraize Meyaski
Represented By: Kenneth Todd Wallace
Represented By: Tina Gutierrez
Represented By: David Wayne Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Najah Julian
Represented By: Stacey LaGraize Meyaski
Represented By: Kenneth Todd Wallace
Represented By: Tina Gutierrez
Represented By: David Wayne Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Tavares
Represented By: Stacey LaGraize Meyaski
Represented By: Kenneth Todd Wallace
Represented By: Tina Gutierrez
Represented By: David Wayne Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Young
Represented By: Stacey LaGraize Meyaski
Represented By: Kenneth Todd Wallace
Represented By: Tina Gutierrez
Represented By: David Wayne Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Watson
Represented By: Stacey LaGraize Meyaski
Represented By: Kenneth Todd Wallace
Represented By: Tina Gutierrez
Represented By: David Wayne Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxane Parra
Represented By: Stacey LaGraize Meyaski
Represented By: Kenneth Todd Wallace
Represented By: Tina Gutierrez
Represented By: David Wayne Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manhattan Fashion, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Ascani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Temptations, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Olano, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Bourbon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Olano, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Famous Bourbon Management Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Palazzolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N'awlins Entertainment Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Temptations Inc doing business as Stiletto's Cabaret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Bourbon, Inc. doing business as Scores French Quarter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manhattan Fashion, LLC doing business as Scores West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Yaffee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?