Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan v. Salty's Marina, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan
Defendant: Salty's Marina, Ltd. and Bent Marine, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv03024
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 21 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #19 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter Farmers Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, and Truck Insurance Exchange as corporate parents at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
January 4, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan of Interested Parties. (Poelma, Randall)
January 4, 2021 Filing 19 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan identifying Corporate Parent Farmers Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, Truck Insurance Exchange for Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan (Poelma, Randall) Modified text/added Corporate Parents on 1/4/2021 (mm).
December 31, 2020 Filing 18 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Bent Marine, LLC (Harris, Rufus)
December 30, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2021 at 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(dp)
December 29, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Salty's Marina, Ltd. Attorney Matthew Armin Moeller added to party Salty's Marina, Ltd.(pty:dft).(Moeller, Matthew)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Denied as moot #11 Motion to Quash. Oral argument set for 1/6/2021 is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 12/18/2020. (ajn)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Plaintiff: ORDERED that, absent an appearance by defendant, Salty's Marina, LTD, plaintiff moves for entry of default on or before January 6, 2021, or show cause by written motion or memorandum, as is appropriate, why this defendant should not be dismissed for plaintiff's failure to prosecute. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal without further notice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 12/16/2020.(ko)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING ORAL ARGUMENT: IT IS ORDERED that Oral Argument on #11 MOTION to Quash will be held via VIDEO CONFERENCE on Wednesday, 1/6/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. A link to join the conference will be circulated to counsel of record via email. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 12/16/2020.(ajn)
December 15, 2020 Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum Served on Donald J. Smith and Port City Marine. **Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the Magistrate Judge. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
December 14, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum Served on Donald J. Smith and Port City Marine by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan. Motion referred to Janis van Meerveld. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Notice of Submission)(Poelma, Randall) Modified text/added referral on 12/15/2020 (mm).
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Randall Jay Poelma, Jr. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 12/07/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko)
December 8, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Bent Marine, LLC.Attorney Rufus C. Harris, III added to party Bent Marine, LLC(pty:dft).(Harris, Rufus)
December 7, 2020 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Randall Jay Poelma, Jr> (Fee previously paid) by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit - Declaration in Support of Admission, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Bargas, Valerie) Modified text on 12/7/2020 (pp).
December 4, 2020 Filing 7 **DEFICIENT**EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8628385) by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit - Declaration in Support of Admission, #3 Proposed Order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Bargas, Valerie) Modified on 12/7/2020 (pp).
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Salty's Marina, Ltd. served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Bargas, Valerie) Modified text on 11/10/2020 (mm).
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 DEFICIENT SUMMONS Returned Executed; Salty's Marina, Ltd. served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Bargas, Valerie) Modified text on 11/10/2020 (lt).
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bent Marine, LLC, Salty's Marina, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(lt)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons Salty's Marina, Ltd.)(Bargas, Valerie)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (go)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Bent Marine, LLC, Salty's Marina, Ltd. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8585058) filed by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Valerie Briggs Bargas added to party Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan(pty:pla).(Bargas, Valerie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan v. Salty's Marina, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salty's Marina, Ltd.
Represented By: Matthew Armin Moeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bent Marine, LLC
Represented By: Alfred Jackson Rufty, III
Represented By: Rufus C. Harris, III
Represented By: Cindy Galpin Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan
Represented By: Valerie Briggs Bargas
Represented By: Randall Jay Poelma, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?